Cunningham v. Brannon
Petitioner: Walter Cunningham
Respondent: Christine Brannon
Not Yet Classified: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2019cv03147
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Gopi Kashyap on behalf of Christine Brannon (Kashyap, Gopi)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 6/10/2019. It is ordered that Respondent, Christine Brannon, has sixty days to file a response to the Petition pursuant to Rule 5. Response due 8/9/2019. See written order. (JMB, ilcd)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5; receipt 44626003536), filed by Walter Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JMB, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christine Brannon
Represented By: Gopi Kashyap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Walter Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?