Bray v. Lathem Time Co.,
Plaintiff: Bret Bray
Defendant: Lathem Time Co.,
Case Number: 3:2019cv03157
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Richard Mills
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Bret Bray. (Wise, Brandon)
August 14, 2019 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #16 is ALLOWED. Extension granted to 8/16/2019. (LB, ilcd)
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Bret Bray. Responses due by 8/16/2019 (Jenkins, Haley)
July 30, 2019 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #15 ALLOWED. Plaintiff granted extension to 8/13/2019 to file his responses to Defendant's Motions to Dismiss #9 #14 . (LB, ilcd)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Bret Bray. Responses due by 8/13/2019 (Jenkins, Haley)
July 17, 2019 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendant's Motion to Strike Docket Entry No. 11 #13 is ALLOWED. Clerk is directed to show Motion to Dismiss #11 as STRICKEN. (LB, ilcd)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Lathem Time Co.,. Responses due by 7/30/2019 (Dean, Christopher)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike DOCKET ENTRY NO. 11 by Defendant Lathem Time Co.,. Responses due by 7/30/2019 (Dean, Christopher)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Lathem Time Co.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dean, Christopher)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER THE COURT'S TEXT ORDER OF 7/17/2019 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Lathem Time Co. Responses due by 7/30/2019 (Dean, Christopher) Modified on 7/18/2019 (MAS, ilcd).
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Lathem Time Co.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dean, Christopher)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Lathem Time Co.,. Responses due by 7/30/2019 (Dean, Christopher)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Haley R Jenkins on behalf of Bret Bray (Jenkins, Haley)
June 21, 2019 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Unopposed Motion of Defendant Lathem Time Corp. for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead #7 ALLOWED. Extension granted to 7/16/2019. (LB, ilcd)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead - Unopposed by Defendant Lathem Time Co.,. Responses due by 7/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Dean, Christopher)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Ryan F Stephan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stephan, Ryan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Brandon Michael Wise on behalf of Bret Bray (Wise, Brandon)
June 19, 2019 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Notice of Removal filed 6/18/2019 reviewed. Plaintiff is given to 7/18/2019 to file objections and a motion to remand. Failure to do so is deemed to mean Plaintiff has no legal opposition to removal and this case may proceed in this court. (LB, ilcd)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jacob Daniel Radecki on behalf of Lathem Time Co., (Radecki, Jacob)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Lathem Time Co.,. (Dean, Christopher)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Christopher Graham Dean on behalf of Lathem Time Co., (Dean, Christopher)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit, Montgomery County, Illinois, case number 2019L8 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3129954), filed by Lathem Time Co.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dean, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bray v. Lathem Time Co.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bret Bray
Represented By: Brandon Michael Wise
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: Haley R Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lathem Time Co.,
Represented By: Christopher Graham Dean
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Radecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?