Williams v. Frerichs et al
Plaintiff: Helene Tonique Williams
Defendant: Michael Frerichs, Executive Committee, Toni Preckwinkle and Illinois State Police
Case Number: 3:2019cv03164
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Exhibit by Helene Tonique Williams. (SKN, ilcd)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Exhibits re #1 Complaint by Helene Tonique Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(GL, ilcd)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Helene Tonique Williams. Responses due by 7/15/2019. (GL, ilcd)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Helene Tonique Williams. Responses due by 7/15/2019. (GL, ilcd)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Helene Tonique Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Proposed Summonses, #3 Envelope)(GL, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Frerichs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Frerichs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toni Preckwinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois State Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helene Tonique Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?