Armour v. Baldwin et al
Plaintiff: Charles W Armour
Defendant: Tracy Cheatham, Daniel Sullivan, John Baldwin, Wexford Health Sources Inc, Daniel Clarke, Debbie Isaacs, Kimberly Smith and Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC)
Case Number: 3:2019cv03240
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (KE, ilcd)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-06042. .
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSFERRED to the USDC for the Central District of Illinois, Springville Division the electronic record. (lma, )
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court transfers this case forthwith to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois, Springville Division for whatever action the transferee court deems appropriate. No summons shall issue from this Court. This case and all pending motions are terminated on this Court's docket. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 10/11/2019. Mailed notice (lma, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Charles W Armour to amend complaint (Exhibits). (Envelope postmarked 9/17/19) (aee, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Charles W Armour for service of process at government expense (las, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Charles W Armour for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Attachment) (las, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (las, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Charles W Armour (Attachments)(Envelope postmarked 9/4/2019) (las, ) Modified on 9/10/2019 (las, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armour v. Baldwin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W Armour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Cheatham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Isaacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?