Curry v. Roberson
Petitioner: Kenneth Curry
Respondent: Kess Roberson
Not Yet Classified: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2019cv03244
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 Circuit Rule 3(b) Fee Notice and ORDER of USCA as to #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Kenneth Curry (JMB, ilcd)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/4/2019. For the reasons stated in the order, the appeal is not taken in good faith and therefore the Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis #8 is DENIED. See written order. (JMB, ilcd)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT In Support re #8 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Kenneth Curry. (DS, ilcd)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 11/19/2019. Petitioner filed a Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis #8 on November 18, 2019. Section 1915 states that "[a]n appeal may not be taken in forma pauperis if the trial court certifies in writing that it is not taken in good faith." 28 U.S.C. section 1915(a)(3). Neither Petitioner's Motion #8 , nor his Notice of Appeal #7 , identifies the grounds for his appeal. Without that information, this court cannot certify that his appeal is taken in good faith. Before denying an appellant's request to proceed on appeal in Forma Pauperis, a district court should give the appellant an opportunity to submit a statement of the grounds for his appeal. See Celske v. Edwards, 164 F.3d 396, 398 (7th Cir. 1999). Petitioner is now given that opportunity. Petitioner's statement of his grounds for appeal are to be filed with this court on or before December 10, 2019. If no grounds are filed, Petitioner's Motion #8 will be denied. ( Miscellaneous Deadline 12/10/2019) (JMB, ilcd)
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Kenneth Curry. USCA Case Number 19-3288. (JMB, ilcd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 Short Record of Appeal Sent to US Court of Appeals re #7 Notice of Appeal (ME, ilcd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Kenneth Curry (ME, ilcd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Petitioner Kenneth Curry. Responses due by 12/2/2019 (ME, ilcd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241 & 2254) by Kenneth Curry. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ME, ilcd)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT entered. (JMB, ilcd)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 10/31/2019. Petitioner's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #3 is GRANTED. Petitioner's Petition #1 is DISMISSED. A certificate of appealability is DENIED. This case is terminated. See written order. (JMB, ilcd)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Kenneth Curry (JMB, ilcd)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Kenneth Curry. Responses due by 11/5/2019 (JMB, ilcd)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM & AFFIDAVIT filed by Kenneth Curry. (DS, ilcd)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kenneth Curry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(DS, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curry v. Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kess Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?