United States of America v. Eisentraut
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jeffrey Eisentraut
Case Number: 3:2019cv03249
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Richard Mills
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service of copy of Order to Show Cause, Petition, Declaration, Last Chance Letter, Summons and Certicate of Service of Summons by personal delivery to Defendant Jeffrey Eisentraut. (Frooman, Hilary)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered by Judge Richard Mills on 12/4/2019. Respondent, Jeffrey Eisentraut ordered to appear before the U S District Court on 1/8/2020 at 2:00 p.m. to show cause why he should not be compelled to obey the IRS summons served upon him on 4/16/2019. (SEE WRITTEN ORDER) (MAS, ilcd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(MAS, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Eisentraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Eisentraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Hilary W Frooman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?