Kodatt v. Pritzker et al
Plaintiff: Steven Kodatt
Defendant: . Waynescott, . Pierce, J B Pritzker, Rob Jeffreys, Nikki Robinson, Amy Burle, Kim Smith and Daniel Clark
Case Number: 3:2019cv03252
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Steven Kodatt.(VH, ilcd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, Unable to Forward re #2 Notice of Case Opening and 10/31/2019 Text Order. (JS, ilcd)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 11/13/2019. Plaintiff has recently filed a complaint which has not yet undergone merit review. At the time of filing, Plaintiff was a prisoner, requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP"). The Court has learned, however, that Plaintiff has recently been paroled to a street address in Lincoln Illinois. Plaintiff is, within 21 days, to file an amended will IFP petition and affidavit, disclosing any current employment, and all sources of income. The clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the IFP forms for non-prisoners. (SAG, ilcd)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven Kodatt. Plaintiff has been released. New address 220 N Logan St., Lincoln, IL 62656. (VH, ilcd)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $3.16. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 10/31/2019. (SAG, ilcd)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Joe Billy McDade. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Steven Kodatt. Responses due by 11/12/2019 (SAG, ilcd)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Steven Kodatt (SAG, ilcd)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Steven Kodatt.(SAG, ilcd)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steven Kodatt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kodatt v. Pritzker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Waynescott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J B Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Jeffreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikki Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Burle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Kodatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?