Anderson v. Wexford Health Sources Inc et al
Plaintiff: Montez Anderson
Defendant: John Doe, 2, John Doe, 3, R Matticks, Wexford Health Sources Inc, Christy Smith, Cameron Watson and John Doe, 1
Case Number: 3:2019cv03262
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Montez Anderson. Wexford Health Sources Inc waiver sent on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020. (KE, ilcd)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Wexford Health Sources Inc, R. Matticks and Christy Smith on 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Smith Waiver, #2 Wexford Health Sources Inc Waiver)(KE, ilcd)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 12/13/2019. See written order.(KE, ilcd)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 12/13/2019. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28U.S.C. Sec 1915A, the Court finds that the plaintiff's complaint states three claims: (1) a claim for deliberate indifference to a serious medical need against Defendants Matticks and Smith; (2) a Monell claim against Defendant Wexford Health Sources, Inc.; and (3) a deliberate indifference claim against the two John Doe correctional officers who kept the plaintiff in leg shackles after his surgery. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the Court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. The Clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. The Clerk is directed to attempt service on Defendants Matticks, Smith, and Wexford Health Sources, Inc., pursuant to the standard procedures. The Clerk is further directed to dismiss Defendant Cameron Watson for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(6); 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915A. The Court will dismiss the John Doe Defendants if the plaintiff does not timely identify and move to amend his complaint with the John Doe's proper name. See written order. Rule 16 Deadline 2/11/2020. (KE, ilcd) Modified on 12/13/2019 to correct typographical error. (KE, ilcd).
December 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 12/11/2019 before Judge Harold A. Baker. Appearance by the Plaintiff Montez Anderson by telephone. Merit Review Hearing held. Allegations of the complaint discussed. Written order to be entered. (Tape #UR-C: 10:16AM.) (JMB, ilcd)
December 2, 2019 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 12/2/2019, in the amount of $ 32.41; receipt number 34626011877 (MAS, ilcd)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 Telephone WRIT issued for Montez Anderson on 12/11/2019 at 10:20 AM for a Merit Review hearing before Judge Baker. (KE, ilcd)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 12/2/2019. A merit review hearing is set for 12/11/2019 at 10:20 a.m., by telephone conference call from Urbana. The clerk is directed to issue a writ to insure plaintiff's appearance at this merit review hearing. (KE, ilcd)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 11/19/2019. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $32.41. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. (KE, ilcd)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Montez Anderson. (KE, ilcd)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 11/19/2019. Plaintiff's motion to request counsel #5 is DENIED. The Court generally will not consider recruiting counsel for a pro se plaintiff until the Court determines that he possess a claim upon which relief can be granted after the Court conducts a merit review of the complaint. Plaintiff may renew his motion if his claim survives a merit review that the Court will conduct in the near future. (KE, ilcd)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (KE, ilcd)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Montez Anderson. Responses due by 11/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(KE, ilcd)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Montez Anderson. (KE, ilcd)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Montez Anderson.(KE, ilcd)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 12/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Montez Anderson.(KE, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Wexford Health Sources Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Matticks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montez Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?