Green v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Green
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv03011
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Before the Court is Defendants' Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel #61 requesting that the Court withdraw Christy D. Jones, Kari L. Sutherland, and William M. Gage of Butler Snow and David B. Thomas and Susan M. Robinson of Thomas, Combs & Spann and substitute Sherry A. Knutson as counsel for Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, and Johnson & Johnson. The above listed attorneys have all consented to the Motion. Therefore, the motion is GRANTED. Sherry A. Knutson is substituted as counsel for Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, and Johnson & Johnson. Jennifer L. Steinmetz of Tucker Ellis, LLP remains as additional counsel for Defendants. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Christy D. Jones, Kari L. Sutherland, William M. Gage, David B. Thomas, and Susan M. Robinson as counsel for Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, and Johnson & Johnson. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 01/29/2020. (SKN, ilcd)
January 17, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Christy D. Jones, Kari L. Sutherland and William M. Gage of Butler Snow and David B. Thomas and Susan M. Robinson of Thomas Combs and Spann to be replaced by Sherry A. Knutson of Tucker Ellis LLP, Attorney Jennifer L. Steinmetz from Tucker Ellis, LLP will continue to also represent defendants by Defendants Ethicon LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Responses due by 1/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knutson, Sherry)
January 17, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Sherry Ann Knutson on behalf of Ethicon LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Knutson, Sherry)
January 10, 2020 Filing 59 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-22087. .
January 6, 2020 Filing 58 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #53 Continued, ECF #2232 - Reply to Motion, #2 Exhibit ECF #2910 - Supplemental Response, #3 Exhibit ECF #6860 - Notice of Adoption, #4 Exhibit ECF #6965 - Notice of Adoption, #5 Exhibit ECF #7143 - Notice of Adoption)(Gage, William)
January 6, 2020 Filing 57 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #53 Continued, ECF #2187 - Response to Motion, #2 Exhibit ECF #2247 - Reply to Motion, #3 Exhibit ECF #2455 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #4 Exhibit ECF #2455 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #5 Exhibit ECF #2458 - Memo ISO Motion, #6 Exhibit ECF #2553 Part 1 - Opposition to Motion, #7 Exhibit ECF #2553 Part 2 - Opposition to Motion, #8 Exhibit ECF #2553 Part 3 - Opposition to Motion, #9 Exhibit ECF #2621 - Reply to Motion, #10 Exhibit ECF #2839 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #11 Exhibit ECF #2839 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #12 Exhibit ECF #2841 - Memo ISO Motion, #13 Exhibit ECF #2957 - Opposition to Motion, #14 Exhibit ECF #3037 - Reply to Motion, #15 Exhibit ECF #6857 - Notice of Adoption, #16 Exhibit ECF #6972 - Notice of Adoption, #17 Exhibit ECF #7113 - Notice of Adoption, #18 Exhibit ECF #2435 - Motion to Exclude, #19 Exhibit ECF #2440 - Memo ISO Motion, #20 Exhibit ECF #2539 - Response to Motion, #21 Exhibit ECF #2924 - Opposition to Motion, #22 Exhibit ECF #6859 - Notice of Adoption, #23 Exhibit ECF #6959 - Notice of Adoption, #24 Exhibit ECF #2060 - Motion to Exclude, #25 Exhibit ECF #2065 - Memo ISO Motion)(Gage, William)
January 6, 2020 Filing 56 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #53 Continued, ECF #3024 - Reply to Motion, #2 Exhibit ECF #5332 - Motion to Exclude, #3 Exhibit ECF #5333 - Memo ISO Motion, #4 Exhibit ECF #5482 - Opposition to Motion, #5 Exhibit ECF #5548 - Reply to Motion, #6 Exhibit ECF #6852 - Notice of Adoption, #7 Exhibit ECF #6960 - Notice of Adoption, #8 Exhibit ECF #2063 Part 1 - Motion to Preclude, #9 Exhibit ECF #2063 Part 2 - Motion to Preclude, #10 Exhibit ECF #2069 - Memo ISO Motion, #11 Exhibit ECF #2184 Part 1 - Response to Motion, #12 Exhibit ECF #2184 Part 2 - Response to Motion, #13 Exhibit ECF #2255 - Opposition to Motion, #14 Exhibit ECF #6796 - Notice of Adoption, #15 Exhibit ECF #6966 - Notice of Adoption, #16 Exhibit ECF #7093 - Notice of Adoption, #17 Exhibit ECF #2087 - Motion to Exclude, #18 Exhibit ECF #2088 - Memo ISO Motion to Exclude, #19 Exhibit ECF #2132 - Opposition to Motion, #20 Exhibit ECF #2244 - Reply to Motion, #21 Exhibit ECF 2939 - Opposition to Motion, #22 Exhibit ECF #6812 - Notice of Adoption, #23 Exhibit ECF #6978 - Notice of Adoption, #24 Exhibit ECF #7135 - Notice of Adoption, #25 Exhibit ECF #2039 - Motion to Exclude)(Gage, William)
January 6, 2020 Filing 55 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #53 Continued, ECF #3814 - Reply to Motion, #2 Exhibit ECF #6830 - Notice of Adoption, #3 Exhibit ECF #6956 - Notice of Adoption, #4 Exhibit ECF #7129 - Notice of Adoption, #5 Exhibit ECF #1815 - Notice of Adoption, #6 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #7 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #8 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 3 - Motion to Exclude, #9 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 4 - Motion to Exclude, #10 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 5 - Motion to Exclude, #11 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 6 - Motion to Exclude, #12 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 7 - Motion to Exclude, #13 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 8 - Motion to Exclude, #14 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 9 - Motion to Exclude, #15 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 10 - Motion to Exclude, #16 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 11 - Motion to Exclude, #17 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 12 - Motion to Exclude, #18 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 13 - Motion to Exclude, #19 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 14 - Motion to Exclude, #20 Exhibit ECF #2049 - Memo ISO Motion, #21 Exhibit ECF #2163 Part 1 - Opposition to Motion, #22 Exhibit ECF #2163 Part 2 - Opposition to Motion, #23 Exhibit ECF #2163 Part 3 - Opposition to Motion, #24 Exhibit ECF #2817 - Motion to Exclude, #25 Exhibit ECF #2818 - Memo ISO Motion)(Gage, William)
January 6, 2020 Filing 54 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #53 Continued, ECF #3633 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit ECF #3633 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #3 Exhibit ECF #3637 - Memo ISO Motion to Exclude, #4 Exhibit ECF #3771 - Opposition to Motion, #5 Exhibit ECF #3836 - Reply to Motion, #6 Exhibit ECF #6647 - Notice of Adoption, #7 Exhibit ECF #6925 - Notice of Adoption, #8 Exhibit ECF #7122 - Notice of Adoption, #9 Exhibit ECF #7342 - Notice of Adoption, #10 Exhibit ECF #3626 Part 1 - Motion to Limit, #11 Exhibit ECF #3626 Part 2 - Motion to Limit, #12 Exhibit ECF #3630 - Memo ISO Motion to Limit, #13 Exhibit ECF #3767 Part 1 - Response to Motion, #14 Exhibit ECF #3767 Part 2 - Response to Motion, #15 Exhibit ECF #3767 Part 3 - Response to Motion, #16 Exhibit ECF #3767 Part 4 - Response to Motion, #17 Exhibit ECF #3855 - Reply to Motion, #18 Exhibit ECF #6648 - Notice of Adoption, #19 Exhibit ECF #6833 - Amended Notice of Adoption, #20 Exhibit ECF #6926 - Notice of Adoption, #21 Exhibit ECF #7123 - Notice of Adoption, #22 Exhibit ECF #3663 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #23 Exhibit ECF #3663 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #24 Exhibit ECF #3663 Part 3 - Motion to Exclude, #25 Exhibit ECF #3666 - Memo ISO Motion to Exclude)(Gage, William)
January 6, 2020 Filing 53 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #238 - First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit ECF #239 - Master Answer - Ethicon, Inc., #3 Exhibit ECF #240 - Master Answer - Ethicon, LLC, #4 Exhibit ECF #241 - Master Answer - Johnson & Johnson, #5 Exhibit ECF #262 - Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF #263 - Amended Short Form Complaint, #7 Exhibit ECF #2082 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #8 Exhibit ECF #2082 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #9 Exhibit ECF #2082 Part 3 - Motion to Exclude, #10 Exhibit ECF #2085 - Memo ISO Motion to Exclude, #11 Exhibit ECF #2181 - Opposition to Motion, #12 Exhibit ECF #2191 - Amended Opposition to Motion, #13 Exhibit ECF #2811 - Motion to Exclude, #14 Exhibit ECF #2815 - Memo ISO Motion to Exclude, #15 Exhibit ECF #2952 - Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #16 Exhibit ECF #5339 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #17 Exhibit ECF #5339 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #18 Exhibit ECF #5340 - Memo ISO Motion to Exclude, #19 Exhibit ECF #5491 - Response to Motion, #20 Exhibit ECF #6842 - Notice of Adoption, #21 Exhibit ECF #6922 - Notice of Adoption, #22 Exhibit ECF #1983 - Motion to Exclude, #23 Exhibit ECF #1985 - Memo ISO Motion to Exclude, #24 Exhibit ECF #2186 - Opposition to Motion, #25 Exhibit ECF #2406 - Notice of Adoption)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/8/2020 to add party filer) (mk).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 1/09/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 1/08/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/19/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #41 AGREED MOTION by Nancy Green For Extension of Time to to Respond to #39 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Certain Case-Specific Opinions of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., to 10/29/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/18/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st)
April 24, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter)(Gage, William)
April 23, 2019 Filing 49 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Nancy Green (Remington, Scott)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mwk) (ADI)
October 29, 2018 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Nancy Green in opposition to #39 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Certain Case-Specific Opinions of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Remington, Scott) (Modified on 11/12/2018 to correct link)(rmc)
October 29, 2018 Filing 45 RESPONSE by Nancy Green in opposition to #39 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Certain Case-Specific Opinions of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Remington, Scott) (Modified on 11/12/2018 to remove link to #40 memorandum)(rmc)
October 25, 2018 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Nancy Green in support of #43 Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Peterson, Jason)
October 25, 2018 Filing 43 RESPONSE by Nancy Green in opposition to #37 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Peterson, Jason)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) (ADI)
October 22, 2018 Filing 41 AGREED MOTION by Nancy Green For Extension of Time to to Respond to #39 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Certain Case-Specific Opinions of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., to 10/29/2018. (Thompson, Trevor)
October 21, 2018 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in support of #39 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Certain Case-Specific Opinions of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D.. (Gage, William)
October 18, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Certain Case-Specific Opinions of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report, #2 Exhibit Pathology Report, #3 Exhibit Pathology Report, #4 Exhibit Pathology Report)(Gage, William)
October 17, 2018 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in support of #37 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Steinmetz, Jennifer)
October 17, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Steinmetz, Jennifer)
September 26, 2018 Filing 36 AMENDED OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #33 Notice to Take Deposition. (Gage, William)
September 20, 2018 Filing 35 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF PARTIES REGARDING THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF'S FRIENDS AND FAMILY MEMBERS by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Nancy Green. (Steinmetz, Jennifer) (Modified on 9/21/2018 to add party filer) (lca).
September 19, 2018 Filing 34 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #33 Notice to Take Deposition. (Gage, William)
September 12, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Nancy Green of Janet Tomezsko, M.D. on 9/26/18 at 5:00 p.m. CST (Peterson, Jason)
August 15, 2018 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendant's Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William)
June 25, 2018 Filing 31 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of David Roszhart, M.D. on July 19, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. CST (Steinmetz, Jennifer)
June 22, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of David Roszhart, M.D. on July 19, 2018 at 1:30 a.m. CST (Steinmetz, Jennifer)
June 18, 2018 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nancy Green for Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories, First Set of Request for Production, and First Requests for Admission. (Peterson, Jason)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (lca) (ADI)
June 12, 2018 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for Responses to First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things, Interrogatories, and Request for Admission. (Steinmetz, Jennifer)
June 4, 2018 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nancy Green for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Peterson, Jason)
May 18, 2018 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things, Interrogatories, and Request for Admission to Plaintiff. (Steinmetz, Jennifer)
May 7, 2018 Filing 24 FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Nancy Green of Dr. Sohail A. Siddique on 06/29/2018 at 8:30 a.m. (CST) (Peterson, Jason)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 MOTION by Michael Zumwalt to Withdraw as Attorney for on behalf of Nancy Green; the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Michael Zumwalt as counsel for the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/3/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mek)
April 29, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Attorney Michael Zumwalt on behalf of Nancy Green (Zumwalt, Michael)
April 20, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jennifer Lynn Steinmetz on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Steinmetz, Jennifer)(Modified on 6/3/2018 to add party filers)(rmc)
April 20, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc. of Nancy Green on May 16, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. (Steinmetz, Jennifer)
April 3, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Alexander Remington on behalf of Nancy Green. (Remington, Scott)
March 19, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Nancy Green of Dr. Sohail A. Siddique on 03/28/2018 at 9:00 a.m. CST (Peterson, Jason)
March 6, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Wade Peterson on behalf of Nancy Green. (Peterson, Jason)
March 6, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Trevor Anthony Thompson on behalf of Nancy Green. (Thompson, Trevor)
March 2, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jeremy Chase Branning on behalf of Nancy Green. (Branning, Jeremy)
February 8, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Dr. David Roszhart on 3/7/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Jones, Alyson)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (klc) (ADI)
June 22, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing by Nancy Green re: #11 Ethicon - Plaintiff Fact Sheet, #10 Ethicon - Plaintiff Profile Form (Friedman, Jeffrey)
June 22, 2017 Filing 11 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Nancy Green. (Friedman, Jeffrey)
June 22, 2017 Filing 10 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Nancy Green. (Friedman, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Based on representation of counsel that Laura H. Dixon no longer represents any party in this MDL or any party in any member case, the above-named counsel is terminated where she appears as counsel for any party in this MDL and in any member case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/5/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kw)
February 6, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William)
February 6, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Laura H. Dixon on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Dixon, Laura)
February 6, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari)
February 6, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy)
September 20, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David)
August 22, 2013 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 61 (Scheduling of Discovery Conferences) entered on 08/12/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (cbo)
August 21, 2013 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, and Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mmw)
August 20, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2618368. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: David B Thomas
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Steinmetz
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Laura H. Dixon
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Sherry Ann Knutson
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: David B Thomas
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Steinmetz
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Laura H. Dixon
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Sherry Ann Knutson
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon LLC
Represented By: David B Thomas
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Steinmetz
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Sherry Ann Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Green
Represented By: Jason Wade Peterson
Represented By: Jeffrey M Friedman
Represented By: Scott Alexander Remington
Represented By: Jeremy Chase Branning
Represented By: Trevor Anthony Thompson
Represented By: Michael Zumwalt
Represented By: Jason Peterson
Represented By: Jeremy Branning
Represented By: Trevor Thompson
Represented By: Scott Remington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?