JTH Tax LLC v. Shaw et al
Plaintiff: JTH Tax LLC
Defendant: RPS Too Inc., Randall P. Shaw and RCAM Accounting & Tax, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv03062
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Case Filing (Germeraad, Jason)
April 6, 2020 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set Monday, 5/11/2020, at 11:00 AM (court will place call) before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Attorneys are directed to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by meeting as soon as practicable, and in any event at least fourteen (14) days prior to the scheduling conference, and are to submit a proposed discovery plan in writing to the Court on or before 5/7/2020. Such a plan must include, at a minimum, those items listed in CDIL-LR 26.2(3), Rule 16(b), Rule 26(f), and CDIL-LR 16.2(F) with proposed deadlines. The parties are directed to specifically address the provisions, if any, for discovery or disclosure of electronically stored information, and to discuss agreements, if any, the parties reach for asserting claims of privilege or of protection as trial preparation material, after inadvertent production. Any plan filed shall specifically address the need, or lack thereof, concerning discovery of electronically stored information. If a discovery plan is not submitted as required, the scheduling hearing will not be held and costs may be assessed. Lead counsel or other counsel of record with knowledge of the case should be available to participate in the Rule 16 scheduling hearing. (LB, ilcd)
April 6, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kelly V Milam on behalf of JTH Tax LLC (Milam, Kelly)
April 3, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by RCAM Accounting & Tax, Inc., RPS Too Inc., Randall P. Shaw.(Germeraad, Jason)
March 19, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JTH Tax LLC re #15 Affidavit of Service of Randall P. Shaw (Gamboa, Paul)
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Verified Complaint served on Randall P. Shaw on March 13, 2020, filed by JTH Tax LLC. (Gamboa, Paul)
March 17, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JTH Tax LLC re #12 Affidavit of Service RPS Too, Inc. (Gamboa, Paul)
March 17, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JTH Tax LLC re #11 Affidavit of Service RCAM Accounting Tax, Inc. (Gamboa, Paul)
March 17, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on RPS Too, Inc. on March 13, 2020, filed by JTH Tax LLC. (Gamboa, Paul)
March 17, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on RCAM Accounting, Inc. on March 13, 2020, filed by JTH Tax LLC. (Gamboa, Paul)
March 5, 2020 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Motion to Strike #9 is ALLOWED. Clerk is directed to show Disclosure Statement #7 as STRICKEN. Entered on 3/5/2020. (ME, ilcd)
March 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE Plaintiff's JTH Tax LLC d/b/a Liberty Tax Service Disclosure Statement (Gamboa, Paul)
March 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike #7 Notice (Other) by Plaintiff JTH Tax LLC. Responses due by 3/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gamboa, Paul)
March 4, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to RCAM Accounting & Tax, Inc., RPS Too Inc., and Randall P. Shaw. Original Summonses mailed to attorney. (MJC, ilcd)
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 STRICKEN per 3/5/2020 Text Order. NOTICE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT FOR JTH TAX LLC d/b/a LIBERTY TAX SERVICE (Gamboa, Paul) Modified on 3/5/2020 to show as stricken. (ME, ilcd).
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Paul Gamboa on behalf of JTH TAX LLC d/b/a LIBERTY TAX SERVICE (Gamboa, Paul)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 Exhibit re #1 Complaint,,,, Summons directed to RCAM Accounting & Tax, Inc. by JTH TAX LLC d/b/a LIBERTY TAX SERVICE. (Gamboa, Paul)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 Exhibit re #1 Complaint,,,, Summons directed to RPS Too, Inc. by JTH TAX LLC d/b/a LIBERTY TAX SERVICE. (Gamboa, Paul)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 Exhibit re #1 Complaint,,,, Summons directed to Randall P. Shaw by JTH TAX LLC d/b/a LIBERTY TAX SERVICE. (Gamboa, Paul)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 Exhibit re #1 Complaint,,,, Civil Cover Sheet by JTH TAX LLC d/b/a LIBERTY TAX SERVICE. (Gamboa, Paul)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES against RCAM ACCOUNTING & TAX, INC., RPS TOO INC., RANDALL P. SHAW ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3321843.), filed by JTH TAX LLC d/b/a LIBERTY TAX SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Beckett Purchase Agreement 12.01.13, #2 Exhibit B - Fehr Purchase Agreement 08.01.14, #3 Exhibit C - Franchise Agreement for IL 273, #4 Exhibit D - Franchise Agreement for IL 107, #5 Exhibit E - Franchise Agreement for IL 109, #6 Exhibit F - Franchise Agreement for IL 110, #7 Exhibit G - Franchise Agreement for IL 108, #8 Exhibit H - Franchise Agreement for IL 111, #9 Exhibit I - Franchise Agreement for IL 043, #10 Exhibit J - 2013 Note, #11 Exhibit K - May 24, 2019 Promissory Note, #12 Exhibit L - Mutual Termination Agreement 11.07.2017, #13 Exhibit M - NTCD Past Monies Owed 08-14-2019, #14 Exhibit N - NTCD Violation of Covenant Not to Compete 08-09-2019, #15 Exhibit O - Termination of Franchise 09-10-2019)(Gamboa, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JTH Tax LLC v. Shaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPS Too Inc.
Represented By: Jason TH Germeraad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall P. Shaw
Represented By: Jason TH Germeraad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCAM Accounting & Tax, Inc.
Represented By: Jason TH Germeraad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JTH Tax LLC
Represented By: Paul Gamboa
Represented By: Kelly V Milam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?