Fox v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Kathleen Fox
Defendant: C R Bard Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv03079
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
2 Judge: Sue E Myerscough
3 Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/30/20. Pursuant to Joint Stipulation and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice #14 and Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this matter is hereby terminated. All pending motions are denied as moot and all scheduled deadlines and court settings are vacated.(SKR, ilcd)
April 29, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION /Joint Stipulation and Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without PreJudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc.. (Elster, Jason)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/16/20. The Court directs the parties to file a joint proposed scheduling order within 14 days. (Proposed scheduling order due by 4/30/20.) (TC, ilcd)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This case is reassigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce for all further proceedings. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 4/15/2020. (MC, ilcd)
April 14, 2020 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendants C.R. Bard, Inc.'s and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Record Withdrawal Following Remand #12 ALLOWED. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. is terminated as counsel for Defendants in this case. (LB, ilcd)
April 13, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Baier, Michael)
April 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Richard North, Jr. to be replaced by Lori G. Cohen, Jason B. Elster and Michael T. Baier, [Unopposed] by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. Responses due by 4/27/2020 (Baier, Michael)
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael Thomas Baier on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Baier, Michael)
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jason B Elster on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Elster, Jason)
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 MDL Remark: United States District Court, District of Arizona, Civil Docket # 16-cv-4217 (Attachment: #1 Docket continued) (MAS, ilcd)
March 27, 2020 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. This case has been opened in the Central District of Illinois after having been transferred by the MDL Court, District of Arizona. Some discovery has been completed. Counsel is directed to e-file a proposed discovery plan for the remaining discovery in writing to the Court on or before June 15, 2020. Such a plan must include, at a minimum, those items listed in CDIL-LR 26.2(3), Rule 16(b), Rule 26(f), and CDIL-LR 16.2(F) with proposed deadlines. Any plan filed shall specifically address the need, or lack thereof, for additional discovery of electronically stored information (ESI) not already accomplished in the MDL proceeding. If additional ESI is needed, the parties are directed to specifically address the provisions, if any, for discovery or disclosure of ESI, and to discuss agreements, if any, the parties reach for asserting claims of privilege or of protection as trial preparation material, after inadvertent production. After the Court's review of the discovery plan, the Court will enter the appropriate scheduling order or set the matter for telephonic conference. (LB, ilcd)
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-04217. Modified on 3/26/2020 to correct e-filed date to 3/25/2020 (MAS, ilcd).
March 25, 2020 Remark - Case transferred to the Central District of Illinois via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD)--See document for details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SJF)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP)
December 5, 2016 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (LSP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
December 5, 2016 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Kathleen Fox. (LSP)
December 5, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-4217-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
December 5, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13675615 filed by Kathleen Fox. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Fox
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Michael Thomas Baier
Represented By: Jason B Elster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Michael Thomas Baier
Represented By: Jason B Elster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?