United States of America v. Hupp et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: County of Sangamon, Scott & Scott P.C., Illinois Department of Revenue, Real Tax Developers Ltd, Timber Creek Management LLC, Michelle L Hupp, Catalyst Consulting Group Inc., Dean A Hupp and Piper Glen Subdivision Association
Case Number: 3:2020cv03110
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Scott & Scott PC on 5/11/2020. (Gadelhak, Ali)
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Timber Creek Management LLC on 5/12/2020. (Gadelhak, Ali)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Sangamon County, Illinois on 5/12/2020. (Gadelhak, Ali)
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Real Tax Developers Ltd. on 5/12/2020. (Gadelhak, Ali)
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Piper Glen Subdivision Association, Inc. on 5/12/2020. (Gadelhak, Ali)
May 20, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Michelle Hupp on 5/11/2020. (Gadelhak, Ali)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Illinois Department of Revenue on 5/12/2020. (Gadelhak, Ali)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Dean Hupp on 5/11/2020. (Gadelhak, Ali)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Catalyst Consulting Group, Inc. on 5/12/2020. (Gadelhak, Ali)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Frederick J Schlosser on behalf of Piper Glen Subdivision Association (Schlosser, Frederick)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Originals returned to Attorney Ali Gadelhak to effectuate service. (GL, ilcd)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Gadelhak, Ali)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hupp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sangamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott & Scott P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Tax Developers Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timber Creek Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle L Hupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catalyst Consulting Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean A Hupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Glen Subdivision Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ali Gadelhak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?