Ford v. Dong et al
Plaintiff: Janet Ford
Defendant: Jin Dong and Angel AI Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv03169
Filed: June 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. TIME LIMITS AND SETTINGS ARE ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Initial Disclosures due by 10/2/2020; Joinder of Parties due by 11/2/2020; Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2020; Plaintiff`s Expert Disclosure due by 3/1/2021; Defendant`s Expert Disclosure due by 6/4/2021; All Discovery due by 9/3/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set 1/31/2022 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 1 in Springfield before U.S. District Judge Sue E. Myerscough. Jury Trial set 2/15/2022 at 9:00 AM before Judge Myerscough. Telephonic Status Conference set Friday, 9/3/2021, at 10:00 AM (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Schanzle-Haskins. See written order. (Attachments: #(1) Mediation Memo, #(2) Courtroom Technology Brochure) (LB, ilcd)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 8/21/2020 with Attorneys Bernard Segatto, Matthew Cate, and Michael Cerulo. Written Scheduling Order to follow. Parties are reminded of their option to consent to proceed before U.S. Magistrate Judge. See attached form. (Attachment: #(1) Form) (LB, ilcd)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Angel AI Inc., Jin Dong. (Cerulo, Michael)
July 30, 2020 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set Friday, 8/21/2020, at 9:00 AM (court will place call) before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Attorneys are directed to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by meeting as soon as practicable, and in any event at least fourteen (14) days prior to the scheduling conference, and are to submit a proposed discovery plan in writing to the Court on or before 8/19/2020. Such a plan must include, at a minimum, those items listed in CDIL-LR 26.2(3), Rule 16(b), Rule 26(f), and CDIL-LR 16.2(F) with proposed deadlines. The parties are directed to specifically address the provisions, if any, for discovery or disclosure of electronically stored information, and to discuss agreements, if any, the parties reach for asserting claims of privilege or of protection as trial preparation material, after inadvertent production. Any plan filed shall specifically address the need, or lack thereof, concerning discovery of electronically stored information. If a discovery plan is not submitted as required, the scheduling hearing will not be held and costs may be assessed. Lead counsel or other counsel of record with knowledge of the case should be available to participate in the Rule 16 scheduling hearing. (LB, ilcd)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Matthew J Cate on behalf of Janet Ford (Cate, Matthew)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Bernard G Segatto, III on behalf of Janet Ford (Segatto, Bernard)
July 6, 2020 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Notice of Removal filed 6/29/2020 reviewed. Plaintiff is given to 7/29/2020 to file objections and a motion to remand. Failure to do so is deemed to mean Plaintiff has no legal opposition to removal and this case may proceed in this court. (LB, ilcd)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Jin Dong.(Cerulo, Michael)
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Angel AI Inc..(Cerulo, Michael)
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael D Cerulo on behalf of Angel AI Inc., Jin Dong (Cerulo, Michael)
June 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sangamon County, case number 2020L 000075 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3411047), filed by Angel AI Inc., Jin Dong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 State Court Notice)(Cerulo, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Dong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Ford
Represented By: Bernard G Segatto, III
Represented By: Matthew J Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jin Dong
Represented By: Michael D Cerulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel AI Inc.
Represented By: Michael D Cerulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?