Walton v. Kolitwenzew
Petitioner: Ivan J Walton
Respondent: Chad Kolitwenzew
Interested Party: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv03178
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 JUDGMENT entered. TC, ilcd)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 9/1/20. Petitioner's writ for habeas corpus #1 is SUMMARILY DISMISSED. Petitioner's other pending motions #2 #3 #4 are moot. See written Order. (TC, ilcd)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 EMERGENCY MOTION for Expedited Ruling by Petitioner Ivan J Walton. Responses due by 9/9/2020 (SKN, ilcd)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend Habeas Corpus Petition by Petitioner Ivan J Walton. Responses due by 9/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(SKN, ilcd)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Petition by Petitioner Ivan J Walton. Responses due by 8/12/2020 (SKN, ilcd)
July 16, 2020 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 14626038077. (JS, ilcd)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5), filed by Ivan J Walton. (Attachments: #1 Bays Affidavit, #2 Hampton Affidavit, #3 Proposed Release Plan, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Envelope) (TC, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walton v. Kolitwenzew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Kolitwenzew
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ivan J Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States of America
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?