Latchford v. Austin et al
Plaintiff: Eric W. Latchford
Defendant: Glen Austin and Illinois Dept. of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2020cv03179
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Eric W. Latchford. New address is Big Muddy River Correctional Center. (JS, ilcd)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 8/3/2020. Plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted #2 . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b) (1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $42.16. Upon receipt of this order, Plaintiff must immediately pay (and his custodial facility must automatically remit) $42.16 to the Clerk of the Court for payment of the initial partial filing fee. Plaintiff is advised failure to pay the initial partial filing fee could lead to the dismissal of his lawsuit. Plaintiff shall then make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source including gifts. The agency having custody of the Plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office.(SAG, ilcd)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 Letter to the Clerk from ProSe Plaintiff Eric Latchford concerning spelling of last name. Clerk forwards copy of docket sheet. (JRK, ilcd)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00677.
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to Court of Correct Spelling of name by Eric W. Latchford. (jaj)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jaj)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 7/14/2020. (ksp)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 20-677-SMY. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 7/10/2020. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 7/10/2020. Consent due by 7/31/2020 (jaj)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric W. Latchfield. (jaj) Modified on 7/16/2020 to reopen (SAG, ilcd).
July 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants filed by Eric W. Latchfield.(jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latchford v. Austin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric W. Latchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?