Dodd v. Isringhausen Imports, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jason C Dodd
Defendant: Isringhausen Imports, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv03181
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Richard Mills
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Isringhausen Imports, Inc.. Responses due by 9/30/2020 (Smith, Brian)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Isringhausen Imports, Inc.. Isringhausen Imports, Inc. waiver sent on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Smith, Brian)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Brian Michael Smith on behalf of Isringhausen Imports, Inc. (Smith, Brian)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Isringhausen Imports, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3428088.), filed by Jason C Dodd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interest)(Devine, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodd v. Isringhausen Imports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isringhausen Imports, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason C Dodd
Represented By: James Albert Devine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?