Sawyer v. I.D.O.C. et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Sawyer
Defendant: Jane Doe, Wexford Health Care, Lincoln Correctional Center, I.D.O.C., Jane and John Doe, . Kottoman, Lisa Hopps and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2020cv03211
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $34.30. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of this order. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source, including gifts. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. Plaintiff is ultimately responsible for ensuring that the initial partial filing fee and required monthly payments are made. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office, and to Plaintiff. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 9/11/2020. (SAG, ilcd)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Patrick Sawyer (SAG, ilcd)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk of Court to Lincoln CC Trust Fund Dept. requesting ledgers 2/18/20 through 8/18/20 (SAG, ilcd)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Patrick Sawyer. Responses due by 9/1/2020 (SAG, ilcd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Patrick Sawyer.(SAG, ilcd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Patrick Sawyer. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sawyer v. I.D.O.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.D.O.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Kottoman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Hopps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?