Towns v. Raoul et al
Plaintiff: Sherrell Towns
Defendant: Chery Rafert, Kwame Raoul, . French, Dana Pitts, James Hackett, Stephanie Robbins, Tom Gibbons, Timothy Gabrielsen, Marshall Rinderer, William R Haine, Joshua Sachs, Susan Jensen, Rob Jeffreys, John Kowski, Neil Hawkins, Justin Hammers, Appolon Beaudouin, Jr, Janet Heflin, Charles V Romani, Jr and Steven Griffins
Case Number: 3:2020cv03214
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 10/8/2020. Plaintiff's motion for access to file his complaint is denied as unnecessary. #8 . Plaintiff's complaint was filed on 8/21/20, the this case was dismissed for failure to state a claim on 8/24/2020. (KE, ilcd)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for access to scanner by Plaintiff Sherrell Towns. Responses due by 9/16/2020 (ME, ilcd)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT entered. (KE, ilcd)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 8/24/2020. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim. This dismissal counts as a strike under 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915(g). Plaintiff's motion for counsel is moot. #5 . The clerk is directed to close this case and enter judgment. If Plaintiff seeks to appeal, Plaintiff must file a notice of appeal in this case within 30 days of the entry of judgment. See written order. (KE, ilcd)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 8/24/2020. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $2.08. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office.. (KE, ilcd)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Sherrell Towns. Responses due by 9/4/2020 (KE, ilcd)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Sherrell Towns (KE, ilcd)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Sherrell Towns.(KE, ilcd)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Sue E Myerscough. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Springfield Division, 600 E Monroe, Springfield,IL 62701.Merit Review Deadline set for 9/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sherrell Towns.(KE, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Towns v. Raoul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chery Rafert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kwame Raoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Gabrielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Rinderer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R Haine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Sachs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Jeffreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Hammers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appolon Beaudouin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Heflin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles V Romani, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Griffins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrell Towns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?