Stone v. C & C Express Trucking Inc
Plaintiff: Randall Stone
Defendant: C & C Express Trucking, Inc. and C & C Express Trucking Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv03219
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice (d/e #2 ). The docket does not reflect that Defendant has been served with notice of this suit, and no answer or motion for summary judgment has been served. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice (d/e #2 ) is GRANTED. Pursuant to the Motion, Plaintiff has dismissed this case with prejudice. Parties to bear their own costs. No judgment to enter. CASE CLOSED. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 10/7/2020. (MAS, ilcd)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Plaintiff Randall Stone. Responses due by 10/19/2020 (Wilson, Bradley)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C & C Express Trucking, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3457770.), filed by Randall Stone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone v. C & C Express Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & C Express Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & C Express Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Stone
Represented By: Bradley B Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?