Payne v. Robbins
Plaintiff: Michael A Payne, II
Defendant: Rick Robbins
Case Number: 3:2020cv03230
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rick Robbins. New address is Macon County Jail, 333 South Franklin St., Decatur, IL 62523. (FDS, ilcd)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff's trust fund ledgers indicate he has no funds to make an initial partial payment of the filing fee. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b) (4), the initial partial filing fee is waived. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office.. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 10/1/2020. (SAG, ilcd)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Michael A Payne, II (FDS, ilcd)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk of Court to Montgomery Co. Jail Trust Fund Dept requesting ledgers 3/2/20 through 9/2/20 (SAG, ilcd)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Michael A Payne, II.(SAG, ilcd)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Michael A Payne, II. Responses due by 10/1/2020 (SAG, ilcd)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 9/8/2020. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1) Plaintiff's motion for emergency injunctive relief is denied. #1 2) Plaintiff must file an amended complaint within 21 days or this order or on or before September 29, 2020 in compliance with this order. Plaintiff must clearly state whether he is filing a lawsuit pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 or a petition for habeas relief. Plaintiff must state whether he is a pretrial detainee or whether he is a convicted prisoner. Plaintiff must also clearly articulate any claims and Defendants. 3) Plaintiff must also pay the appropriate filing fee for his action ($400 for lawsuit pursuant to 42 U.S.C.1983 or $5 for a habeas petition) or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis within 21 days of this order or on or before September 29, 2020. 4) If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint in compliance with the order or fails to either pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed IFP on or before September 29, 2020, his case will be dismissed without prejudice. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG, ilcd)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Michael Payne. Responses due by 9/16/2020 (SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A Payne, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?