Wan v. Debolt
Petitioner: Chung Chui Wan
Respondent: Michel Dale Debolt
Interested Party: T.D. and A.D.
Case Number: 3:2020cv03233
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 11604
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Motion for Expedited Scheduling Hearing #28 ALLOWED. Expedited Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set Wednesday, 11/18/2020, at 1:30 PM (court will place call) before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Attorneys are directed to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by meeting as soon as practicable and to submit a proposed discovery plan in writing to the Court on or before 11/13/2020. Such a plan must include, at a minimum, those items listed in CDIL-LR 26.2(3), Rule 16(b), Rule 26(f), and CDIL-LR 16.2(F) with proposed deadlines. The parties are directed to specifically address the provisions, if any, for discovery or disclosure of electronically stored information, and to discuss agreements, if any, the parties reach for asserting claims of privilege or of protection as trial preparation material, after inadvertent production. Any plan filed shall specifically address the need, or lack thereof, concerning discovery of electronically stored information. If a discovery plan is not submitted as required, the scheduling hearing will not be held and costs may be assessed. Lead counsel or other counsel of record with knowledge of the case should be available to participate in the Rule 16 scheduling hearing. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 11/6/2020. (MAS, ilcd)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #28 MOTION to Expedite Scheduling Hearing filed by Respondent Michel Dale Debolt. (Elster, Matthew)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER BY U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendant is directed to respond by 11/5/2020 to Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Scheduling Hearing #28 . Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 11/4/2020. (MAS, ilcd)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Expedite Scheduling Hearing by Petitioner Chung Chui Wan. Responses due by 11/17/2020 (Feinberg, Joy)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Michel Dale Debolt.(Elster, Matthew)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL DOCUMENT (Sealed Order) UNREDACTED (MAS, ilcd)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (MAS, ilcd)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The parties submitted a proposed Parenting Order to the Court. However, the parties did not indicate whether the guardian ad litem, Attorney Jared Scott, approved the proposed Parenting Order. Also, GAL Scott was not included on the email from the parties to the Court. Therefore, the parties are DIRECTED to immediately notify the Court whether GAL Scott approves of the Parenting Order. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 10/29/2020. (DM, ilcd)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPINION entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 10/26/2020. The Respondent's Motion to Dismiss, d/e #14 is DENIED. (SEE WRITTEN OPINION) (MAS, ilcd)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Enrico J Mirabelli on behalf of Michel Dale Debolt. (Mirabelli, Enrico)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue E. Myerscough: MOTION HEARING held on 10/23/2020 before Judge Sue E. Myerscough. Court and court personnel by video. Petitioner Chung Chui Wan present via video. Attorneys Joy Feinberg and Reuben Bernick of Feinberg Sharma present via video on behalf of the Petitioner. Respondent Michel Dale Debolt present via video. Attorneys Shana Vitek and Enrico Mirabelli of Beerman LLP and Attorneys Howard Feldman and John Morse of Feldman Wasser present via video on behalf of Respondent. GAL Jared Scott of Scott & Scott present via video. Oral arguments as to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss heard. Issue regarding U.S. Dept of State letter addressed. Matter taken under advisement with ruling by Monday. Discussion held regarding Parenting Order which will be presented to Court. Hearing adjourned. (Court Reporter KS.) (DM, ilcd)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (MAS, ilcd)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Based on the discussion with the parties at the hearing, Petitioner's Motion for Access and Expedited Hearing (d/e #9 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Petitioner's Motion for Expedited Pretrial Conference (d/e #8 ) is GRANTED. An expedited pretrial conference is SET for November 23, 2020, at 3:30 p.m. via video conference. The Court also SETS a hearing on Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (d/e #14 ) for October 23, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. via video conference. All participants shall attend the hearings via video conferencing. Instructions for the video conferences are attached. Additionally, based on the oral motion for appointment of a guardian ad litem, the Court hereby appoints Jared Scott of Scott & Scott, P.C. as Guardian Ad Litem to the children in this case. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 10/15/2020. (DM, ilcd)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue E. Myerscough: MOTIONS HEARING held on 10/14/2020 before Judge Sue E. Myerscough. Court and court personnel by video. Petitioner Chung Chui Wan present via video. Attorneys Joy Feinberg and Reuben Bernick of Feinberg Sharma present via video. Respondent Michel Dale Debolt present via video. Attorneys Shana Vitek and Enrico Mirabelli of Beerman LLP and Attorneys Howard Feldman and John Morse of Feldman Wasser present via video on behalf of Respondent. Counsel advised the Court that a tentative access order had been worked out and proceeded to outline same. Issue regarding minors' passports and retention with the Court addressed. Expedited Pretrial Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 3:00 PM and the oral arguments as to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss set for 10/23/2020 at 2:30 PM all before Judge Sue E. Myerscough via video. Discussion held regarding mediation with the Magistrate Judge as well as issue as to Guardian Ad Litem appointment. Court will advise parties of GAL appointment. Attorney Mirabelli was administered the Oath of Office for admission into the Central District of Illinois. Hearing adjourned. (Court Reporter KS.) (DM, ilcd)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Petitioner Chung Chui Wan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Feinberg, Joy)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Expedite Hearing and for Access filed by Respondent Michel Dale Debolt. (Elster, Matthew)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Expedite Pretrial Conference filed by Respondent Michel Dale Debolt. (Elster, Matthew)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: Before the Court is Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (d/e #14 ). The Petitioner is DIRECTED to respond to Respondent's motion to dismiss by Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The Court hereby SETS a video hearing on the motion to dismiss for Wednesday, October 14, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. All participants shall attend the hearing via video conferencing. Instructions for the video conference are attached. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 10/8/2020. (MAS, ilcd)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CONCERNING CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN CASES INVOLVING INITIAL DISPOSITIVE MOTION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 10/8/2020. (Attachments: #(1) Notice, #(2) Form) (LB, ilcd)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: Before the Court is Petitioner's Motion for Expedited Pretrial Conference (d/e #8 ) and Motion for Access and Expedited Hearing (d/e #9 ). The Respondent is DIRECTED to respond to Petitioner's Motion for Expedited Pretrial Conference (d/e #8 ) and Motion for Access and Expedited Hearing (d/e #9 ) by Friday, October 9, 2020. The Court hereby SETS a video hearing on the aforementioned motions for Wednesday, October 14, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. All participants shall attend the hearing via video conferencing. Instructions for the video conference are attached. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 10/7/2020. (MAS, ilcd)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Michel Dale Debolt. (Feldman, Howard)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Respondent Michel Dale Debolt. Responses due by 10/21/2020 (Feldman, Howard)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John S M Morse on behalf of Michel Dale Debolt (Morse, John)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Howard W Feldman on behalf of Michel Dale Debolt (Feldman, Howard)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Matthew David Elster on behalf of Michel Dale Debolt (Elster, Matthew)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Shana Lynn Vitek on behalf of Michel Dale Debolt (Vitek, Shana)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Expedite Hearing and for Access by Petitioner Chung Chui Wan. Responses due by 10/16/2020 (Feinberg, Joy)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite Pretrial Conference by Petitioner Chung Chui Wan. Responses due by 10/16/2020 (Feinberg, Joy)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chung Chui Wan. Chung Chui Wan served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. (Feinberg, Joy)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Docket Entry #3 ALLOWED. The Docket Entry No. 2 is STRICKEN as filed in error inadvertently. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 9/10/2020. (MAS, ilcd)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Michel Dale Debolt. (SKN, ilcd)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joy M Feinberg on behalf of Chung Chui Wan (Feinberg, Joy)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Reuben A Bernick on behalf of Chung Chui Wan (Bernick, Reuben)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Strike Docket Entry by Petitioner Chung Chui Wan. Responses due by 9/23/2020 (Feinberg, Joy)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER THE COURT'S TEXT ORDER OF 9/10/2020
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition for Return of the Minor Children to Hong Kong against Michel Dale Debolt ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3468907.), filed by Chung Chui Wan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(Feinberg, Joy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wan v. Debolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michel Dale Debolt
Represented By: Matthew David Elster
Represented By: Howard W Feldman
Represented By: John S M Morse
Represented By: Enrico J Mirabelli
Represented By: Shana Lynn Vitek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chung Chui Wan
Represented By: Joy M Feinberg
Represented By: Reuben A Bernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: T.D. and A.D.
Represented By: Jared M Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?