Turuc v. State of Illinois et al
Plaintiff: James Turuc
Defendant: State of Illinois, Kwame Raoul, Ashley Clement, Wexford Health Care, IDOC Systems, Gregg Scott, State of IL, . Baker, J.B. Pritzker and Rob Jeffries
Case Number: 3:2020cv03235
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 16 SWORN AFFIDAVIT by James Turuc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(DS, ilcd)
October 20, 2020 Filing 15 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by James Turuc. (DS, ilcd)
October 20, 2020 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 10/20/2020, in the amount of $ 23.56; receipt number 14626038842 (AEM, ilcd)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 Exhibit re #13 MOTION for Leave to File by James Turuc. (DS, ilcd)
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff James Turuc. Responses due by 10/27/2020 (KE, ilcd)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff James Turuc. Responses due by 10/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Request Counsel, #2 Envelope)(DS, ilcd)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 10/8/2020. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $23.56. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of this order. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source, including gifts. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. Plaintiff is ultimately responsible for ensuring that the initial partial filing fee and required monthly payments are made. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office, and to Plaintiff. Prisoner Prepayment due by 11/9/2020 (KE, ilcd)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by James Turuc. (KE, ilcd)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (KE, ilcd)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against State of Illinois, Kwame Raoul, J.B. Pritzker, Rob Jeffries, Gregg Scott, State of IL, IDOC Systems, Wexford Health Care,. Baker, Ashley Clement, filed by James Turuc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DS, ilcd)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by James Turuc (KB, ilcd)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by James Turuc.(KB, ilcd)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 9/11/2020. Plaintiff has filed a Complaint but has not paid the $400 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 21 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff must pay the $400 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis with attached trust fund ledgers for the last 6 months. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Plaintiff will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis. (KE, ilcd)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-05163. .
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 TRANSFERRED to the Central District of Illinois, Springfield Division the electronic record. (mc, )
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: For the reasons set forth below, this case is transferred to the Central District of Illinois, Springfield Division. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case forthwith. The Clerk is directed to terminate this case and all motions on this docket. Civil case transferred. Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/8/2020. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (mc, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by James Turuc. (Envelope not postmarked). (mc, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 1 Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice.(mc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turuc v. State of Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Turuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kwame Raoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDOC Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of IL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B. Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?