Simmons v. Illinois Dept of Human Rights
Plaintiff: Kenneth Simmons
Defendant: Illinois Dept of Human Rights and IDHR
Case Number: 3:2020cv03243
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Illinois Dept of Human Rights. Illinois Dept of Human Rights waiver sent on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Dion, Kristina)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kristina Dawn Dion on behalf of Illinois Dept of Human Rights (Dion, Kristina)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Address of IDHR by Plaintiff Kenneth Simmons. (MJC, ilcd)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Before the Court is pro se Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs #2 . For good cause show, motion #2 ALLOWED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send notice of lawsuit waiver of service forms to the Defendant along with a copy of the Complaint, two copies of the waiver form, and a prepaid envelope to return the form by first class mail to the Clerk. If the Defendant fails to sign and return a waiver within 30 days from the date said forms were sent, the Court will direct personal service by the U.S. Marshal at the Defendant's expense. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is to notify the parties of their option to consent to disposition of this case before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by providing the Plaintiff with a magistrate judge consent form and accompanying Court explanation. Upon receipt of the signed consent from the Plaintiff, the Clerk is further directed to forward the consent to the Defendant for consideration. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 9/22/2020. (MAS, ilcd)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kenneth Simmons. Responses due by 9/30/2020 (MAS, ilcd)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Illinois Dept of Human Rights, filed by Kenneth Simmons.(MAS, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Illinois Dept of Human Rights
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Dept of Human Rights
Represented By: Kristina Dawn Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDHR
Represented By: Kristina Dawn Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?