Foust v. Clarke
Petitioner: David Foust
Respondent: Daniel Clarke
Not Classified By Court: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2020cv03253
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 24626009685 (JMB, ilcd)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 10/15/2020. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 is DENIED. Petitioner is allowed thirty days to pay the $5.00 filing fee. If the filing fee is not paid within thirty days, the petition will be dismissed without prejudice. See written Order.(DS, ilcd)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by David Foust. (DS, ilcd)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner David Foust. Responses due by 10/9/2020. (DS, ilcd)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by David Foust. (Attachments: #1 Index of Appendix, #2 Exhibit)(DS, ilcd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2020: #3 Envelope) (KM, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foust v. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Foust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?