Union Pacific Railroad Company v. Illinois Mine Subsidence Insurance Fund
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Defendant: Illinois Mine Subsidence Insurance Fund
Case Number: 3:2020cv03281
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. Illinois Mine Subsidence Insurance Fund waiver sent on 10/26/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Mendoza, Riley)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff filed a Motion to Consolidate (d/e #6 ). The Court will reserve ruling on the Motion until Defendant Illinois Mine Subsidence Insurance Fund has been served and has responded to the Motion. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 10/28/2020. (SKN, ilcd)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Heidi Weber on October 26, 2020. (Mendoza, Riley)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company. Responses due by 11/6/2020 (Mendoza, Riley)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Erika A Dirk on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company (Dirk, Erika)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Gary Michael Elden on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company (Elden, Gary)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Mendoza, Riley)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Riley Caroline Mendoza on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company (Mendoza, Riley)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief against Illinois Mine Subsidence Insurance Fund ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3501930.), filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mendoza, Riley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Pacific Railroad Company v. Illinois Mine Subsidence Insurance Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Mine Subsidence Insurance Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Riley Caroline Mendoza
Represented By: Gary Michael Elden
Represented By: Erika A Dirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?