Garcia et al v. Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Al. H., Jennifer Zuniga, Consuelo Diana Perez, Jesus Javier Zuniga Silva, Lidianelly Carreon Garcia, Jose E. Zuniga, Mario H Gonzalez, Vanessa Guzman, Luis Alonzo Sifuentes, Ediel Tanguma Trevino, Miguel Sifuentes, S. V., Yadira Zuniga, Maria Abigail Zuniga, V. A., Liliana Rodriguez, Alberto Montalvo, Jr., David Carreon Vazquez, Gilbert Sanchez, Jr., An. H., Ja. Z., Adrian Perez, Hada Garcia, Patricia Rodriguez, A. P., Alberto Montalvo, Sr., Judith Valdez, Ramon Hernandez, Jr., E. R., Y. C., J. J. Z., Ad. H. and L. C.
Defendant: Unknown Pesticide Applicator #1, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc., Corteva, Inc., Farm Air, Inc. and Curless Flying Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv03322
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 29:1854
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Corteva, Inc., Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. (Sanchez, Brian)
February 3, 2021 Filing 33 STIPULATION Regarding Rule 26(f) Conference by V. A., L. C., Y. C., Lidianelly Carreon Garcia, David Carreon Vazquez, Hada Garcia, Mario H Gonzalez, Vanessa Guzman, Ad. H., Al. H., An. H., Ramon Hernandez, Jr, Alberto Montalvo, Sr, Alberto Montalvo, Jr., A. P., Adrian Perez, Consuelo Diana Perez, E. R., Liliana Rodriguez, Patricia Rodriguez, Gilbert Sanchez, Jr, Luis Alonzo Sifuentes, Miguel Sifuentes, Ediel Tanguma Trevino, S. V., Judith Valdez, J. J. Z., Ja. Z., Jennifer Zuniga, Jose E. Zuniga, Maria Abigail Zuniga, Yadira Zuniga, Jesus Javier Zuniga Silva.. (Hallbauer, Miriam)
January 29, 2021 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Agreed Motion for Extension of Time #31 ALLOWED. Deadline for all Defendants to answer or otherwise plead is extended to 3/3/2021. (LB, ilcd)
January 29, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Heather D Erickson on behalf of Corteva, Inc., Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. (Erickson, Heather)
January 28, 2021 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Plaintiffs V. A., L. C., Y. C., Lidianelly Carreon Garcia, David Carreon Vazquez, Hada Garcia, Mario H Gonzalez, Vanessa Guzman, Ad. H., Al. H., An. H., Ramon Hernandez, Jr, Alberto Montalvo, Sr, Alberto Montalvo, Jr., A. P., Adrian Perez, Consuelo Diana Perez, E. R., Liliana Rodriguez, Patricia Rodriguez, Gilbert Sanchez, Jr, Luis Alonzo Sifuentes, Miguel Sifuentes, Ediel Tanguma Trevino, S. V., Judith Valdez, J. J. Z., Ja. Z., Jennifer Zuniga, Jose E. Zuniga, Maria Abigail Zuniga, Yadira Zuniga, Jesus Javier Zuniga Silva. Responses due by 2/11/2021 (Hallbauer, Miriam)
January 7, 2021 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendants' Farm Air, Inc. and Curless Flying Service, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Docket Nos. #21 and #22 (d/e #25 ) is ALLOWED. Clerk is directed to show docket entries #21 and #22 as STRICKEN. Entered on 1/7/2021. (MJC, ilcd)
January 6, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Daniel R Formeller on behalf of Farm Air, Inc. (Formeller, Daniel)
January 6, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Daniel R Formeller on behalf of Curless Flying Service, Inc. (Formeller, Daniel)
January 6, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jennifer Marie Theodore on behalf of Farm Air, Inc. (Theodore, Jennifer)
January 6, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jennifer Marie Theodore on behalf of Curless Flying Service, Inc. (Theodore, Jennifer)
January 6, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Brian H Sanchez on behalf of Corteva, Inc., Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. (Sanchez, Brian)
January 6, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Strike #21 Notice of Appearance of Attorney, #22 Notice of Appearance of Attorney by Defendants Curless Flying Service, Inc., Farm Air, Inc.. Responses due by 1/20/2021 (Banovetz, Mark)
January 4, 2021 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Y. C., L. C., S. V., Alberto Montalvo, Jr., Jose E. Zuniga, Luis Alonzo Sifuentes, Lidianelly Carreon Garcia, Hada Garcia, Miguel Sifuentes, An. H., Gilbert Sanchez, Jr, Jennifer Zuniga, J. J. Z., Ad. H., Judith Valdez, V. A., Ja. Z., A. P., Maria Abigail Zuniga, Liliana Rodriguez, Jesus Javier Zuniga Silva, Patricia Rodriguez, Yadira Zuniga, Al. H., Alberto Montalvo, Sr, David Carreon Vazquez, Adrian Perez, E. R., Vanessa Guzman, Consuelo Diana Perez, Mario H Gonzalez, Ediel Tanguma Trevino, Ramon Hernandez, Jr. Curless Flying Service, Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (Hallbauer, Miriam)
January 4, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Y. C., L. C., S. V., Alberto Montalvo, Jr., Jose E. Zuniga, Luis Alonzo Sifuentes, Lidianelly Carreon Garcia, Hada Garcia, Miguel Sifuentes, An. H., Gilbert Sanchez, Jr, Jennifer Zuniga, J. J. Z., Ad. H., Judith Valdez, V. A., Ja. Z., A. P., Maria Abigail Zuniga, Liliana Rodriguez, Jesus Javier Zuniga Silva, Patricia Rodriguez, Yadira Zuniga, Al. H., Alberto Montalvo, Sr, David Carreon Vazquez, Adrian Perez, E. R., Vanessa Guzman, Consuelo Diana Perez, Mario H Gonzalez, Ediel Tanguma Trevino, Ramon Hernandez, Jr. Farm Air, Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (Hallbauer, Miriam)
December 31, 2020 Filing 22 STRICKEN PER 1/7/21 TEXT ORDER - NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mark T Banovetz on behalf of Farm Air, Inc. (Banovetz, Mark) Modified on 1/7/2021 (MJC, ilcd).
December 31, 2020 Filing 21 STRICKEN PER 1/7/21 TEXT ORDER - NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mark T Banovetz on behalf of Curless Flying Service, Inc. (Banovetz, Mark) Modified on 1/7/2021 (MJC, ilcd).
December 31, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mark T Banovetz on behalf of Farm Air, Inc. (Banovetz, Mark)
December 31, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mark T Banovetz on behalf of Curless Flying Service, Inc. (Banovetz, Mark)
December 30, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by S. V., Alberto Montalvo, Jr., Jose E. Zuniga, Luis Alonzo Sifuentes, Hada Garcia, Miguel Sifuentes, An. H., Gilbert Sanchez, Jr, Jennifer Zuniga, J. J. Z., Ad. H., Judith Valdez, Ja. Z., A. P., Maria Abigail Zuniga, Liliana Rodriguez, Jesus Javier Zuniga Silva, Patricia Rodriguez, Yadira Zuniga, Al. H., Alberto Montalvo, Sr, Adrian Perez, E. R., Vanessa Guzman, Consuelo Diana Perez, Mario H Gonzalez, Ediel Tanguma Trevino, Ramon Hernandez, Jr. Corteva, Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (Hallbauer, Miriam)
December 30, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by S. V., Alberto Montalvo, Jr., Jose E. Zuniga, Luis Alonzo Sifuentes, Hada Garcia, Miguel Sifuentes, An. H., Gilbert Sanchez, Jr, Jennifer Zuniga, J. J. Z., Ad. H., Judith Valdez, Ja. Z., A. P., Maria Abigail Zuniga, Liliana Rodriguez, Jesus Javier Zuniga Silva, Patricia Rodriguez, Yadira Zuniga, Al. H., Alberto Montalvo, Sr, Adrian Perez, E. R., Vanessa Guzman, Consuelo Diana Perez, Mario H Gonzalez, Ediel Tanguma Trevino, Ramon Hernandez, Jr. Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (Hallbauer, Miriam)
December 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Daniela Dwyer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dwyer, Daniela)
December 17, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Grace C Kube on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kube, Grace)
December 9, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to The Corporation Trust Company as Agent of Defendant on 12/2/2020. (Palumbo, Lisa)
December 9, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to John D. McMillan as Agent for Farm Air, Inc. on 12/2/2020. (Palumbo, Lisa)
December 9, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to John D. McMillan as Agent for Farm Air, Inc. on 12/2/2020. (Palumbo, Lisa)
December 9, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to CT Corporation System as Agent for Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. on 12/2/2020. (Palumbo, Lisa)
December 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mariyam N Hussain on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hussain, Mariyam)
December 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Agnes Kim Baik on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Baik, Agnes)
December 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lauren Marie Dana on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dana, Lauren)
December 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lisa J Palumbo on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Palumbo, Lisa)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Eugene A Schoon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Schoon, Eugene)
December 4, 2020 Notice of Docket Modification re #1 Complaint: Civil Cover Sheet attached to Complaint as it was inadvertently omitted. NEF regenerated to parties. (MJC, ilcd)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Howard A Learner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Learner, Howard)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Ann Jaworski on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jaworski, Ann)
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by V. A., L. C., Y. C., Lidianelly Carreon Garcia, David Carreon Vazquez, Hada Garcia, Mario H Gonzalez, Vanessa Guzman, Ad. H., Al. H., An. H., Ramon Hernandez, Jr, Alberto Montalvo, Sr, Alberto Montalvo, Jr., A. P., Adrian Perez, Consuelo Diana Perez, E. R., Liliana Rodriguez, Patricia Rodriguez, Gilbert Sanchez, Jr, Luis Alonzo Sifuentes, Miguel Sifuentes, Ediel Tanguma Trevino, S. V., Judith Valdez, J. J. Z., Ja. Z., Jennifer Zuniga, Jose E. Zuniga, Maria Abigail Zuniga, Yadira Zuniga, Jesus Javier Zuniga Silva. (Hallbauer, Miriam)
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Miriam Veronica Hallbauer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hallbauer, Miriam)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0753-3535580.), filed by Y. C., L. C., S. V., Alberto Montalvo, Jr., Jose E. Zuniga, Luis Alonzo Sifuentes, Lidianelly Carreon Garcia, Hada Garcia, Miguel Sifuentes, An. H., Gilbert Sanchez, Jr, Jennifer Zuniga, J. J. Z., Ad. H., Judith Valdez, V. A., Ja. Z., A. P., Liliana Rodriguez, Patricia Rodriguez, Al. H., Alberto Montalvo, Sr, David Carreon Vazquez, Adrian Perez, E. R., Vanessa Guzman, Consuelo Diana Perez, Mario H Gonzalez, Ediel Tanguma Trevino, Ramon Hernandez, Jr.(Hallbauer, Miriam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MJC, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia et al v. Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al. H.
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Zuniga
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consuelo Diana Perez
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Javier Zuniga Silva
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidianelly Carreon Garcia
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose E. Zuniga
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario H Gonzalez
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Guzman
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Alonzo Sifuentes
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ediel Tanguma Trevino
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Sifuentes
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. V.
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yadira Zuniga
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Abigail Zuniga
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. A.
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liliana Rodriguez
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Montalvo, Jr.
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Carreon Vazquez
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Sanchez, Jr.
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: An. H.
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ja. Z.
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Perez
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hada Garcia
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Rodriguez
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. P.
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Montalvo, Sr.
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Valdez
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Hernandez, Jr.
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. R.
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y. C.
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. J. Z.
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ad. H.
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. C.
Represented By: Miriam Veronica Hallbauer
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace C Kube
Represented By: Eugene A Schoon
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dana
Represented By: Agnes Kim Baik
Represented By: Mariyam N Hussain
Represented By: Howard A Learner
Represented By: Lisa J Palumbo
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Pesticide Applicator #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
Represented By: Heather D Erickson
Represented By: Brian H Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Represented By: Heather D Erickson
Represented By: Brian H Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Air, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R Formeller
Represented By: Mark T Banovetz
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curless Flying Service, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R Formeller
Represented By: Mark T Banovetz
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?