United States of America v. $579,410.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $579,410.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 3:2020cv03333
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Richard Mills
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF FORFEITURE ACTION TO BRADLEY TOMPKINS, JR. (Kim, Richard)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WARRANT / Writ of Body Attachment Returned Executed as to $579,410.00 in U S Currency. Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on asset on 12/18/2020. (MAS, ilcd)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 +++ WARRANT/WRIT OF BODY ATTACHMENT issued (sealed). (MAS, ilcd)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against $579,410.00 in U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 USM 285)(MAS, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $579,410.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $579,410.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Richard Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?