Devlin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lori Ann Devlin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC and CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv03343
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security; Office of the U S Attorney General served by certified mail on 1/28/2021. (MAS, ilcd)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U S Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 1/7/2021. (MAS, ilcd)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Frooman, Hilary)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/5/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(MAS, ilcd)
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Drummond, Peter)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins:Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . For good cause shown, motion ALLOWED. Clerk is directed to prepare Summons and Marshal's Form USM 285 for service of Complaint on Defendants by U.S. Marshal's Office. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is to notify the parties of their option to consent to disposition of this case before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by providing the Plaintiff with a Magistrate Judge consent form and accompanying Court explanation. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 12/29/2020. (MAS, ilcd)
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Peter C Drummond on behalf of Lori Ann Devlin (Drummond, Peter)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lori Ann Devlin. Responses due by 1/11/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supplement Affidavit)(Drummond, Peter)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Lori Ann Devlin. (Attachments: #1 Unfavorable Decision, #2 Appeals Council Decision, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Drummond, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devlin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: US ATTY-SPRINGFIELD SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Ann Devlin
Represented By: Peter C Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?