Tipsord v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tina S. Tipsord
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2021cv03018
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Richard Mills
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Originals returned to Attorney Frederick J. Daley, Jr. to effectuate service. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Tipsord)(GL, ilcd)
February 12, 2021 Filing fee: $402, receipt number 14626039904. (JS, ilcd)
January 15, 2021 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs #2 . In reviewing the Application, the Court notes that based upon what is shown, Plaintiff's income exceeds his expenses by $687.00 per month. Plaintiff's Application #2 is DENIED. Plaintiff directed to pay filing fee on or before 2/16/2021 or risk the dismissal of this case. Alternatively, Plaintiff may file any additional financial information he would like the Court to consider. (LB, ilcd)
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Meredith E Marcus on behalf of Tina S. Tipsord (Marcus, Meredith)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Frederick J Daley, Jr on behalf of Tina S. Tipsord (Daley, Frederick)
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 PETITION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tina S. Tipsord. Responses due by 1/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 USM-285 (Commissioner), #2 USM-285 (Attorney General), #3 USM-285 (U.S. Attorney))(Daley, Frederick)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Tina S. Tipsord. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses Combined)(Daley, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tipsord v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina S. Tipsord
Represented By: Meredith E Marcus
Represented By: Frederick J Daley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?