FE Demolition and Remediation, LLC v. New Mill Capital Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: FE Demolition and Remediation, LLC
Defendant: First United Bank and Trust Company, New Mill Capital Holdings, LLC, Non-Record Claimants, Unknown Owners, Unknown Necessary Parties and 1200 North Logan, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv03088
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Richard Mills
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First United Bank and Trust Company. (St. Onge, Britton)
June 11, 2021 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM FIRST UNITED BANK AND TRUST COMPANYS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT I OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR RELIEF re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FIRST UNITED BANK AND TRUST COMPANYS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT I OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR RELIEF by First United Bank and Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(St. Onge, Britton)
June 11, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FIRST UNITED BANK AND TRUST COMPANYS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT I OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR RELIEF by Defendant First United Bank and Trust Company. Responses due by 6/25/2021 (St. Onge, Britton)
June 11, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NEW MILL CAPITAL HOLDINGS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR RELIEF re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANT NEW MILL CAPITAL HOLDINGS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR RELIEF by New Mill Capital Holdings, LLC. (St. Onge, Britton)
June 11, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANT NEW MILL CAPITAL HOLDINGS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR RELIEF by Defendant New Mill Capital Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 6/25/2021 (St. Onge, Britton)
June 10, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FE Demolition and Remediation, LLC. 1200 North Logan, LLC served on 6/2/2021, answer due 6/23/2021. (Riccione, John)
June 7, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Second Amended Complaint served on First United Bank and Trust Company c/o Spend Life Wisely Company, Inc., Registered Agent on 6/4/2021, filed by FE Demolition and Remediation, LLC. (Riccione, John)
June 7, 2021 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. First United Bank and Trust Company's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Second Amended Complaint #15 and New Mill Capital Holdings, LLC's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Second Amended Complaint #14 are ALLOWED. Extensions granted to 6/11/2021 for Defendants First United Bank and Trust Company and New Mill Capital Holdings, LLC to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. (LB)
June 3, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Amended Complaint FIRST UNITED BANK AND TRUST COMPANYS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Defendant First United Bank and Trust Company. Responses due by 6/17/2021 (St. Onge, Britton)
June 3, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Amended Complaint NEW MILL CAPITAL HOLDINGS, LLCS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Defendant New Mill Capital Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 6/17/2021 (St. Onge, Britton)
June 3, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Britton Laurence St. Onge on behalf of First United Bank and Trust Company (St. Onge, Britton)
May 27, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to 1200 North Logan, LLC, and as to First United Bank and Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SKN) Modified on 5/27/2021 to add that both summons returned by mail to Plaintiff's counsel to effectuate service. (SKN).
May 27, 2021 Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification re #12 Summons Issued. Modified to show issued summons were returned to Plaintiff's counsel, via conventional mail, to effectuate service. (SKN)
May 21, 2021 Filing 11 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against First United Bank and Trust Company; New Mill Capital Holdings, LLC; Non-Record Claimants; Unknown Necessary Parties; Unknown Owners and 1200 North Logan, LLC, filed by FE Demolition and Remediation, LLC.(MAS)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Instanter #8 (Motion) is ALLOWED. The Clerk is directed to file the proposed Second Amended Complaint attached to the Motion as Exhibit 1. Defendant New Mill Capitol Holdings, LLC, (New Mill) shall respond to the Second Amended Complaint by 6/4/2021. Defendant New Mill's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Join Necessary Parties and for Failure to State a Claim for Relief #3 (Motion to Dismiss) will be moot unless specifically revived by New Mill by 6/4/2021. Local Rule 7.1(E). New Mill retains the right to revive the Motion to Dismiss or file a new motion to dismiss should it so elect. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 5/21/2021. (MAS)
May 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Britton Laurence St. Onge on behalf of New Mill Capital Holdings, LLC (St. Onge, Britton)
May 20, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Instanter DEFENDANT NEW MILL CAPITAL HOLDINGS, LLCS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant New Mill Capital Holdings, LLC. (St. Onge, Britton)
May 6, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Instanter by Plaintiff FE Demolition and Remediation, LLC. Responses due by 5/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Riccione, John)
May 6, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANT NEW MILL CAPITAL HOLDINGS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO JOIN NECESSARY PARTIES AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR RELIEF filed by Plaintiff FE Demolition and Remediation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Riccione, John)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Adam W Decker on behalf of FE Demolition and Remediation, LLC (Decker, Adam)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John Michael Riccione on behalf of FE Demolition and Remediation, LLC (Riccione, John)
April 29, 2021 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Notice of Removal filed 4/15/2021 reviewed. Plaintiff is given to 5/15/2021 to file objections and a motion to remand. Failure to do so is deemed to mean Plaintiff has no legal opposition to removal and this case may proceed in this court. (LB)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NEW MILL CAPITAL HOLDINGS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO JOIN NECESSARY PARTIES AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR RELIEF re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANT NEW MILL CAPITAL HOLDINGS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO JOIN NECESSARY PARTIES AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR RELIEF by New Mill Capital Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lewis, Rodney)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANT NEW MILL CAPITAL HOLDINGS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO JOIN NECESSARY PARTIES AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR RELIEF by Defendant New Mill Capital Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 5/6/2021 (Lewis, Rodney)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by New Mill Capital Holdings, LLC. (Lewis, Rodney)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Logan County, case number 2021CH1 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0753-3636727), filed by New Mill Capital Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Lewis, Rodney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FE Demolition and Remediation, LLC v. New Mill Capital Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First United Bank and Trust Company
Represented By: Britton Laurence St. Onge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mill Capital Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Rodney L Lewis
Represented By: Britton Laurence St. Onge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Non-Record Claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Necessary Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1200 North Logan, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FE Demolition and Remediation, LLC
Represented By: John Michael Riccione
Represented By: Adam W Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?