Reid v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Barbara Hazel Reid
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2021cv03097
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lindsay Beyer Payne on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Payne, Lindsay)
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Commissioner of Social Security served on 5/11/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. (Attachment: #1 Complaint)(MAS)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER VACATING DENIAL OF APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 5/11/2021. The Court's Text Orders denying Plaintiff's application to proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs are VACATED. The Plaintiff's Applications to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, d/e #2 and #3 are ALLOWED and Plaintiff may proceed with this matter without the payment of filing fees due to her financial status. The Plaintiff's Objection, d/e #4 is DENIED as MOOT. (SEE WRITTEN ORDER) (MAS)
May 5, 2021 Filing 4 OBJECTION to Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, by Barbara Hazel Reid. (Olinsky, Howard)
April 28, 2021 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Before the Court is Plaintiff's Supplemental Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs #3 (Application). The Application lists as an asset an empty lot with a value of $5,000. The Plaintiff indicates the property was a gift from her father and it is the only thing she has left to sell. While the Court is sympathetic to the Plaintiff's financial plight, the Court cannot let litigants choose to retain valuable assets when asking the Court to waive payment of filing fees. Plaintiff's Application is DENIED. Plaintiff is directed to pay the filing fee on or before 5/24/2021. (LB)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 Supplemental MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Barbara Hazel Reid. Responses due by 5/11/2021 (Olinsky, Howard)
April 27, 2021 TEXT ORDER entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs #2 (Application) is DENIED. The Application indicates the Plaintiff owns an "empty" lot worth $5,000 and pays taxes monthly on the real estate. Due to ownership of this asset, the Court denies Plaintiff's Application. Plaintiff is directed to pay the filing fee on or before 5/24/2021. If the Plaintiff has an explanation as to why the real estate cannot be liquidated to obtain funds to pay the filing fee, the Plaintiff may re-submit her Application with the explanation. (LB)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Barbara Hazel Reid.(Olinsky, Howard)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Barbara Hazel Reid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Exhibit B: Plaintiff SSN, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 USM-285 Form, #8 USM-285 Form, #9 USM-285 Form)(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: US ATTY-SPRINGFIELD SSA
Represented By: Lindsay Beyer Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Hazel Reid
Represented By: Howard D Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?