Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company et al v. Adams et al
Plaintiff: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company and Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company
Defendant: Flicia Daniels, Roberta Nicholas, Anthony Lyons, CTF ILLINOIS an Illinois Not-For-Profit Corporation doing business as Charleston Transitional Facility, Zachariah Adams and Richard Levine
Case Number: 3:2021cv03137
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 15 Exhibit re #13 MOTION to Stay Exhibit B by Richard Levine. (Shore, Megan)
August 18, 2021 Filing 14 Exhibit re #13 MOTION to Stay Exhibit A by Richard Levine. (Shore, Megan)
August 18, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay by Defendant Richard Levine. Responses due by 9/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shore, Megan)
July 30, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Flicia Daniels answer due 7/23/2021. (MAS)
July 30, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Anthony Lyons answer due 7/27/2021. (MAS)
July 30, 2021 Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification regarding #9 Affidavit of Service, Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer); #10 Affidavit of Service, Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer); #11 Affidavit of Service and #12 Affidavit of Service: Clerk modified the aforementioned docket entries to reflect the correct event to be used which is "Summons returned Executed" instead of "Affidavit of Service". Clerk set answer deadlines for defendants Flicia Daniels and Anthony Lyons. (MAS)
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Anthony Lyons; served on 07/06/2021, filed by Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Piegore, John) Modified on 7/30/2021 (MAS).
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Flicia Daniels; served on 07/02/2021, filed by Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Piegore, John) Modified on 7/30/2021 (MAS).
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. Roberta Nicholas served on 7/3/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (Piegore, John) Modified on 7/30/2021 (MAS).
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. Zachariah Adams served on 7/3/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (Piegore, John) Modified on 7/30/2021 (MAS).
July 26, 2021 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendant Richard Levine's Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead #8 is ALLOWED. Extension granted to 8/18/2021. (LB)
July 21, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Please by Defendant Richard Levine. Responses due by 8/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Shore, Megan)
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Megan M Shore on behalf of Richard Levine (Shore, Megan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Roberta Nicholas and forwarded to the Plaintiffs' attorney for effectuation of service. (MAS)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Anthony Lyons and forwarded to the Plaintiffs' attorney for effectuation of service. (MAS)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Flicia Daniels and forwarded to the Plaintiffs' attorney for effectuation of service. (MAS)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CTF ILLINOIS and forwarded to the Plaintiffs' attorney for effectuation of service. (MAS)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Zachariah Adams and forwarded to the Plaintiffs' attorney for effectuation of service. (MAS)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zachariah Adams, CTF ILLINOIS, Flicia Daniels, Richard Levine, Anthony Lyons and Roberta Nicholas, filed by Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company and Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402.00 paid, pay.gov tracking # 26SG9O60; agency tracking # AILCDC-3695317) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 1A, #4 Exhibit 2, part 1, #5 Exhibit 2, part 2, #6 Exhibit 2, part 3, #7 Exhibit 2, part 4, #8 Exhibit 2, part 5, #9 Exhibit 3)(MAS)
June 22, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Sue E. Myerscough and Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. (MAS) Modified on 6/23/2021 (MAS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company et al v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: John J Piegore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company
Represented By: John J Piegore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flicia Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberta Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTF ILLINOIS an Illinois Not-For-Profit Corporation doing business as Charleston Transitional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachariah Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Levine
Represented By: Megan M Shore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?