Woods v. Neil Oil Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Woods
Defendant: Neil Oil Company, Inc. and David Neil
Case Number: 3:2021cv03184
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Woods. Neil Oil Company, Inc. served on 10/11/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Barack, Max)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to David Neil, Neil Oil Company, Inc. and returned to Plaintiff's counsel to effectuate service. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SKN)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Matthew T Fletcher on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fletcher, Matthew)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Max Phillip Barack on behalf of Timothy Woods (Barack, Max)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Neil, Neil Oil Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3736870.), filed by Timothy Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barack, Max)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Neil Oil Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Woods
Represented By: Max Phillip Barack
Represented By: Matthew T Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Oil Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?