Evans v. Ross et al
Plaintiff: JuQuavion Q Evans
Defendant: Marilyn Hite Ross, Joseph Lesner, Robert Redmond, Tim Owens, Dan O'Shea, Rockford Police Department Administration, Gary Caruana, Rob Lukowski and Winnebago County Jail Administration
Case Number: 3:2021cv03214
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, re #4 . Mail sent to Juquavion Evans (KE)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, re Remark entered on 10/04/2021. Mail sent to JuQuavion Q. Evans. (SKN)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 10/4/2021. The Court, in the interest of justice and for the convenience of the parties and witnesses, transfers this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec 1404(a) to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois for whatever action(s) the transferee court deems appropriate. The Clerk shall not issue summons or take any actions on Plaintiff's motions unless the transferee court so directs. (KE)
October 4, 2021 Case transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. Case was electronically submitted to the transferee court. (KE)
October 4, 2021 Remark: Case transferred from Illinois Central has been opened in Northern District of Illinois - CM/ECF LIVE, Ver 6.3.3 as case 1:21-cv-05239, filed 10/04/2021. (ME)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff JuQuavion Q Evans. Responses due by 10/15/2021 (KE)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by JuQuavion Q Evans.(KE)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JuQuavion Q Evans. (Attachments: #1 USM Form, #2 Envelope)(KE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Ross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JuQuavion Q Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Hite Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockford Police Department Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Caruana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Lukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winnebago County Jail Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?