Swanson et al v. Murray Brothers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Julie Swanson and Margarita Martinez
Defendant: Jimmie Dale Cox, Murray Brothers, LLC, Larry Murray Trucking Inc and Piramal Glass-USA, Inc.
Intervenor: Janice Neubrand
Case Number: 3:2021mc03003
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. For efficient disposition and record keeping purposes, the Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Motion to Quash #1 , Motion to Quash or Modify Plaintiff Martinez's Subpoena #4 , Plaintiff's Response #7 , and Defendant Murray Bros, LLC's Reply #13 in the related case of Swanson, et al v. Murray Brothers, LLC, et al, 19-cv-3220. The Clerk is DIRECTED to add Janice Neubrand as an intervenor in case no. 19-cv-3220 only as to the pending motions to quash. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 5/5/2021. (MAS)
May 4, 2021 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. This matter has been transferred from the Eastern District of Missouri. At the time of the transfer, Janice Neubrand's Motion to Intervene #10 (Motion) was pending. She indicates that she wishes to file a motion to quash. The Motion is ALLOWED. Intervenor Neubrand is directed to file any motion to quash by 5/17/2021. Parties may respond by 5/24/2021. (LB)
April 30, 2021 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:21-mc-00081. .
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This case was incorrectly opened as a civil case. The Clerk is directed to reopen this case as a miscellaneous case. See miscellaneous case number 21-mc-3003. Civil Case Terminated. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 4/30/2021. (MC)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Larry Murray and Larry Murray Trucking, Inc.'s Motion to Quash, Doc. #1 , and Murray Brothers, LLC's Motion to Quash, Doc. #4 , shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois. The Clerk of this Court is directed to transfer the case accordingly. (Case to be transferred after 4/26/2021.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 4/12/2021. (TMT)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER Re: #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Devin M. Taseff by Defendant Murray Brothers, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 3/4/2021. (TMT)
March 4, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Devin M. Taseff. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8511032) by Defendant Murray Brothers, LLC. (Taseff, Devin)
March 1, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Quash or Modify Plaintiff Martinez's Subpoena to Janice Neubrand of Crouch, Farley & Heuring, PC filed by Defendant Murray Brothers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hunsaker, Richard)
February 26, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT to #10 MOTION to Intervene by Defendant Larry Murray Trucking, Inc... (Wilke, James)
February 24, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor Janice Neubrand. (Zoole, Mark)
February 24, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Janice Neubrand. (Zoole, Mark)
February 18, 2021 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Larry Murray Trucking, Inc.. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Wilke, James)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER Re: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Timothy J. Deffet by Plaintiff Margarita Martinez; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 2/18/2021. (TMT)
February 17, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash with receipt number AMOEDC-8448588, in the amount of $49, #4 MOTION to Quash or Modify Plaintiff Martinez's Subpoena to Janice Neubrand of Crouch, Farley & Heuring, PC filed by Plaintiff Margarita Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form)(Deffet, Timothy)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Timothy J. Deffet. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8478100) by Plaintiff Margarita Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form)(Deffet, Timothy)
February 4, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Murray Brothers, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Hunsaker, Richard)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Quash or Modify Plaintiff Martinez's Subpoena to Janice Neubrand of Crouch, Farley & Heuring, PC by Defendant Murray Brothers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hunsaker, Richard)
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S ORDER (GJL) - The above case was originally filed as a Civil Case. Upon review it was determinded to be a Miscellaneous case. Therefore, this case will be administratively closed. A new Miscellaneous Case - 4:21mc81 MTS - has been opened (BAK)
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash with receipt number AMOEDC-8448588, in the amount of $49, filed by Larry Murray Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lee Murray Depo, #2 Exhibit Larry Murray)(Wilke, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swanson et al v. Murray Brothers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Janice Neubrand
Represented By: Mark H. Zoole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmie Dale Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray Brothers, LLC
Represented By: Richard K Hunsaker
Represented By: Devin Michael Taseff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Murray Trucking Inc
Represented By: James A Wilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piramal Glass-USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Martinez
Represented By: Timothy J Deffet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?