Illinois Fuel & Retail Association et al v. Illinois Department of Revenue et al
Plaintiff: Illinois Fuel & Retail Association, Saunders Oil Co., Inc. and Freedom Oil Company
Defendant: Illinois Department of Revenue, Director of IDOR David . Harris, State's Attorne Daniel Wright, David . Harris and Daniel Wright
Case Number: 3:2022cv03089
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Karen L McNaught
Referring Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION and ORDER entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 7/13/2022. Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, d/e #19 is GRANTED. This case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of the Seventh Judicial Circuit, Sangamon County, Illinois. Any pending deadlines are TERMINATED and, any scheduled settings are VACATED. This case is CLOSED. No judgment to enter. (SEE WRITTEN OPINION & ORDER) (MAS)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendants David. Harris, Illinois Department of Revenue, Daniel Wright. (Hemmer, Alex)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against David. Harris, Illinois Department of Revenue, Daniel Wright, filed by Freedom Oil Company, Illinois Fuel & Retail Association, Saunders Oil Co., Inc..(Craven, Donald)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Freedom Oil Company, Illinois Fuel & Retail Association, Saunders Oil Co., Inc.. Responses due by 7/21/2022 (Craven, Donald)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs have filed a Motion to Remand (d/e #19 ) in which Plaintiffs request the Court remand this case back to the Circuit Court of the Seventh Judicial Circuit of Illinois, Sangamon County, Illinois. Defendants are directed to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion by noon July 14, 2022. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 7/7/2022. (MAS)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPINION and ORDER entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 6/23/2022. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, d/e #10 is GRANTED. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT, all pending deadlines are TERMINATED and, any scheduled settings are VACATED. Plaintiffs are given leave to file an amended complaint within 14 days of the entry of this Order. If plaintiffs fail to do so, this case may be subject to dismissal with prejudice for failure to prosecute under Local Rule 7.1(B)(2). (SEE WRITTEN OPINION AND ORDER) (MAS)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY in Support of #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants David Harris, Illinois Department of Revenue and Daniel Wright. (MAS)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss (d/e #16 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk shall docket the attached proposed Reply as such. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 6/22/2022. (MAS)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendants David. Harris, Illinois Department of Revenue, Daniel Wright. Responses due by 7/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tichy, David)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiffs Freedom Oil Company, Illinois Fuel & Retail Association, Saunders Oil Co., Inc.. (Craven, Donald)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: Defendants have filed a Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (d/e #12 ), a Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class (d/e #13 ), and a Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (d/e #10 ). In light of the briefing, the Court RESETS the hearing on the Motion for a Preliminary Injunction to Friday, June 24, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. to take place via videoconference, the instructions for which are attached. Given the July 1, 2022 effective date of 35 ILCS 505/2(a-5), the Court also RESETS Plaintiff's Response due date to the Motion to Dismiss to Friday, June 17, 2022 at 12:00 p.m. (noon) pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(c)(1)(C). Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 6/14/2022. (MAS) Modified on 6/14/2022 (MAS).
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification regarding #14 Text Order entered 6/14/2022: Text Order corrected to reflect the Motion Hearing day from Thursday to Friday, June 24, 2022. Corrected Text Order regenerated to the Court and parties. (MAS)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Defendants David. Harris, Illinois Department of Revenue, Daniel Wright. (Hemmer, Alex)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants David. Harris, Illinois Department of Revenue, Daniel Wright. (Hemmer, Alex)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants David. Harris, Illinois Department of Revenue, Daniel Wright. (Tichy, David)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants David. Harris, Illinois Department of Revenue, Daniel Wright. Responses due by 6/27/2022 (Tichy, David)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The Court, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(c)(1)(C), GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule (d/e #8 ) which, Plaintiff states, Defendants do not oppose. The Court SETS a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction to be held on Wednesday, June 15, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. All participants shall attend via videoconference, the instructions for which are attached. Defendants are directed to file their Responses to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (d/e #6 ) and Motion to Certify Class (d/e #4 ) by Monday, June 13, 2022 at 5:00 p.m. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 6/7/2022. (GL)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite Breifing Schedule by Plaintiffs Freedom Oil Company, Illinois Fuel & Retail Association, Saunders Oil Co., Inc.. Responses due by 6/21/2022 (Craven, Donald)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Freedom Oil Company, Illinois Fuel & Retail Association, Saunders Oil Co., Inc.. (Craven, Donald)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Freedom Oil Company, Illinois Fuel & Retail Association, Saunders Oil Co., Inc.. Responses due by 6/21/2022 (Craven, Donald)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Certify Class by Freedom Oil Company, Illinois Fuel & Retail Association, Saunders Oil Co., Inc.. (Craven, Donald)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiffs Freedom Oil Company, Illinois Fuel & Retail Association, Saunders Oil Co., Inc.. Responses due by 6/21/2022 (Craven, Donald)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David Tichy on behalf of David. Harris, Illinois Department of Revenue, Daniel Wright (Tichy, David)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Alex Hemmer on behalf of All Defendants (Hemmer, Alex)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sangamon County Circuit Court, case number 2022-MR-227 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3953093), filed by Illinois Department of Revenue, Daniel Wright, David. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tichy, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Illinois Fuel & Retail Association et al v. Illinois Department of Revenue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Fuel & Retail Association
Represented By: Donald M Craven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saunders Oil Co., Inc.
Represented By: Donald M Craven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom Oil Company
Represented By: Donald M Craven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department of Revenue
Represented By: Alex Hemmer
Represented By: David Tichy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of IDOR David . Harris
Represented By: Alex Hemmer
Represented By: David Tichy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State's Attorne Daniel Wright
Represented By: Alex Hemmer
Represented By: David Tichy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David . Harris
Represented By: Alex Hemmer
Represented By: David Tichy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Wright
Represented By: Alex Hemmer
Represented By: David Tichy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?