Barlow-Johnson et al v. Tinsley
Plaintiff: Kendra Barlow-Johnson and Justin Dennis
Defendant: William Tinsley
Case Number: 3:2022cv03215
Filed: October 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Karen L McNaught
Referring Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2022 Filing 9 RULE 12(C) NOTICE entered regarding #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule 12 of Civil Procedure Rule (ANW)
November 21, 2022 Filing 8 RULE 12(C) NOTICE entered regarding #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule 12 of Civil Procedure Rule (ANW)
November 18, 2022 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant's re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule 12 of Civil Procedure Rule by William Tinsley. (Lytle, Daniel)
November 18, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule 12 of Civil Procedure Rule by Defendant William Tinsley. Responses due by 12/2/2022 (Lytle, Daniel)
November 18, 2022 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by William Tinsley. (Lytle, Daniel)
November 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Daniel C Lytle on behalf of William Tinsley (Lytle, Daniel)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 10/27/22. The previously issued summons #3 is quashed due to a clerical error. (ANW)
October 20, 2022 Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification re [1-1]: Corrected document received from Plaintiff on 10/19/2022. (ME)
October 19, 2022 Filing 3 QUASHED pursuant to 10/27/22 Text Order - Summons Issued as to William Tinsley. (Attachments: #1 usm 285)(ANW) Modified on 10/27/2022 (ANW).
October 19, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Kendra Barlow-Johnson, Justin Dennis.(ANW) Modified on 10/20/2022 to correct event type (ANW). Modified on 10/20/2022 to change event used in CMECF (JRK).
October 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Tinsley, filed by Kendra Barlow-Johnson, Justin Dennis. (Attachments: #1 extra info, #2 civil cover sheet)(ANW) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/20/2022) (ME).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barlow-Johnson et al v. Tinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Barlow-Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Tinsley
Represented By: Daniel C Lytle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?