Justice v. Barr
Plaintiff: Trevor L Justice
Defendant: Denise Barr
Case Number: 3:2022cv03251
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Karen L McNaught
Referring Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Trevor L Justice from Stateville CC to Vandalia CC. (DS)
December 19, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address to Stateville Correctional Center by Trevor L Justice (KE)
December 12, 2022 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, re Mail sent to Trevor L. Justice. Text Order regenerated to Plaintiff at Stateville CC. (KE)
December 7, 2022 Filing 7 Letter from Mason County Sheriff's Office regarding Plaintiff's release. (KE)
December 7, 2022 NOTICE: The Clerk of the Court has been informed by Mason County Sheriff's Office that effective immediately, Plaintiff has been transferred from Mason County Jail to Illinois Department of Corrections. The Mason County Sheriff's Office has conveyed this information simply as a courtesy to the Clerk of the Court.Plaintiff is reminded that he is under a continuing obligation to keep the Clerk and each opposing party informed of any change in his location. Pursuant to Central District of Illinois Local Rule 16.3(K), every pro se plaintiff must notify the Clerk of this court in writing of any change of address during the entire pendency of his case. It is not the Court's responsibility to independently maintain current addresses on all parties to pending actions. As a courtesy to Plaintiff, however, the Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Notice to Plaintiff at the institution where he has reportedly been transferred. Plaintiff shall, no later than 14 days from the date of this Notice, file a notice of change of address with the Clerk. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action.Notice of Change of Address to be filed by plaintiff by 12/21/2022 (KE)
November 30, 2022 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Trevor L Justice. (KE)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 11/30/2022. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $13.60. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of this order. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source, including gifts. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office, and to Plaintiff. Prisoner Prepayment due by 12/30/2022. (KE)
November 21, 2022 Filing 5 Letter Requesting Trust Fund Ledger. Trust Fund Ledgers due by 12/5/2022. (KE)
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Trevor L Justice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (KE)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Trevor L Justice.(KE)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Sue E Myerscough. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 12/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Trevor L Justice. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Justice v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor L Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?