Viehweg v. Insurance Programs Management Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: William H Viehweg
Defendant: Insurance Programs Management Group, LLC, City of Mount Olive, John M Skertich, Joe Berry, Melinda Zippay, Marcia Schulte, Howard Hall, Richard Webb, Ernie Parish, Steve Remer, Leah Wheatley, John Goldacker, Chuck Cox, Dan O'Brien, Molly Margaritas, Jeff Bone, Bradley G Hummert, Henry Meisenheimer & Gende, Inc., O'Holloran Kosoff Geitner & Cook, LLC, Karen L McNaught, Lawrence E Neyland, Benjamin Jacobi, Joseph Bracey, Brown & James, P.C., John P Cunningham, Daniel G Hasenstab and Gregg Peterson
Case Number: 3:2023cv03047
Filed: February 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
2 Judge: Karen L McNaught
3 Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION filed by Defendants Joe Berry, Jeff Bone, Joseph Bracey, City of Mount Olive, Chuck Cox, John Goldacker, Howard Hall, Insurance Programs Management Group, LLC, Benjamin Jacobi, Molly Margaritas, Karen L McNaught, Lawrence E Neyland, Dan O'Brien, O'Holloran Kosoff Geitner & Cook, LLC, Ernie Parish, Gregg Peterson, Steve Remer, Marcia Schulte, John M Skertich, Richard Webb, Leah Wheatley, Melinda Zippay. (Bracey, Joseph)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Matthew F Kennelly on 4/14/2023. Defendants' consent motion to continue the 5/1/2023 case management conference #15 is granted. The telephonic case management conference set for 5/1/2023 is vacated and reset to 5/3/2023 at 8:30 AM. The following call-in number will be used: 888-684-8852; access code 746-1053. Defendant City of Mt. Olive's consent motion for extension of time #14 is granted; due date for response to complaint is extended to 5/1/2023. Plaintiff's motion to disqualify #12 will be discussed at the case management conference. (MJC)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Consent MOTION to Continue May 1, 2023 Case Management Conference by Defendants Joe Berry, Jeff Bone, Joseph Bracey, City of Mount Olive, Chuck Cox, John Goldacker, Howard Hall, Insurance Programs Management Group, LLC, Benjamin Jacobi, Molly Margaritas, Karen L McNaught, Lawrence E Neyland, Dan O'Brien, O'Holloran Kosoff Geitner & Cook, LLC, Ernie Parish, Gregg Peterson, Steve Remer, Marcia Schulte, John M Skertich, Richard Webb, Leah Wheatley, Melinda Zippay. Responses due by 4/26/2023 (Bracey, Joseph)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, (Unopposed) by Defendant City of Mount Olive. Responses due by 4/26/2023 (Bracey, Joseph)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 (1st Amended) by Joe Berry, Jeff Bone, Joseph Bracey, City of Mount Olive, Chuck Cox, John Goldacker, Howard Hall, Insurance Programs Management Group, LLC, Benjamin Jacobi, Molly Margaritas, Karen L McNaught, Lawrence E Neyland, Dan O'Brien, O'Holloran Kosoff Geitner & Cook, LLC, Ernie Parish, Gregg Peterson, Steve Remer, Marcia Schulte, John M Skertich, Richard Webb, Leah Wheatley, Melinda Zippay. (Bracey, Joseph)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Disqualify Defendant Joseph Bracey as His Own Legal Counsel by Plaintiff William H Viehweg. Responses due by 4/19/2023. (JPS)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William H Viehweg. Joe Berry, Jeff Bone, Joseph Bracey, Brown & James, P.C., Chuck Cox, John P Cunningham, John Goldacker, Howard Hall, Daniel G Hasenstab, Henry Meisenheimer & Gende, Inc., Bradley G Hummert, Insurance Programs Management Group, LLC, Benjamin Jacobi, Molly Margaritas, Karen L McNaught, Lawrence E Neyland, Dan O'Brien, O'Holloran Kosoff Geitner & Cook, LLC, Ernie Parish, Gregg Peterson, Steve Remer, Marcia Schulte, John M Skertich, Richard Webb, Leah Wheatley, and Melinda Zippay waiver sent on 2/28/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Summons Continued) (JPS)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Joe Berry, Jeff Bone, Joseph Bracey, City of Mount Olive, Chuck Cox, John Goldacker, Howard Hall, Insurance Programs Management Group, LLC, Benjamin Jacobi, Molly Margaritas, Karen L McNaught, Lawrence E Neyland, Dan O'Brien, O'Holloran Kosoff Geitner & Cook, LLC, Ernie Parish, Gregg Peterson, Steve Remer, Marcia Schulte, John M Skertich, Richard Webb, Leah Wheatley, Melinda Zippay. (Bracey, Joseph)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Bhairav Radia on behalf of Joe Berry, Jeff Bone, Joseph Bracey, City of Mount Olive, Chuck Cox, John Goldacker, Howard Hall, Insurance Programs Management Group, LLC, Benjamin Jacobi, Molly Margaritas, Karen L McNaught, Lawrence E Neyland, Dan O'Brien, O'Holloran Kosoff Geitner & Cook, LLC, Ernie Parish, Gregg Peterson, Steve Remer, Marcia Schulte, John M Skertich, Richard Webb, Leah Wheatley, Melinda Zippay (Radia, Bhairav)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Matthew F Kennelly on 3/24/2023. The City of Mt. Olive's motion for extension of time #8 is granted. The due date for the City's response to the complaint is extended to 4/13/2023. The Court notes that appearances of counsel have been filed for most of the defendants. The Court also notes that the City of Mt. Olive's motion indicates that the responses of most of the other defendants to the complaint will be due on or about 4/25/2023. The Court therefore sets the case for an initial telephonic case management conference on 5/1/2023 at 8:40 AM. The following call-in number will be used: 888-684-8852; access code 746-1053. (MJC)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer), #1 Complaint,,, (Responsive Pleading Deadline) by Defendant City of Mount Olive. Responses due by 4/6/2023 (Bracey, Joseph)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joseph Bracey on behalf of Joe Berry, Jeff Bone, Joseph Bracey, City of Mount Olive, Chuck Cox, John Goldacker, Howard Hall, Insurance Programs Management Group, LLC, Benjamin Jacobi, Molly Margaritas, Karen L McNaught, Lawrence E Neyland, Dan O'Brien, O'Holloran Kosoff Geitner & Cook, LLC, Ernie Parish, Gregg Peterson, Steve Remer, Marcia Schulte, John M Skertich, Richard Webb, Leah Wheatley, Melinda Zippay (Bracey, Joseph)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PURSUANT TO DESIGNATION OF THE SEVENTH CIRCUIT - This case is reassigned to Judge Matthew F Kennelly for further proceedings. Entered by Chief Judge Diane S. Sykes, United States Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit on 3/8/2023. (MC)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service by William H Viehweg (Attachments: #1 envelope)(RES)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William H Viehweg. City of Mount Olive served on 2/23/2023, answer due 3/16/2023. (RES)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Letter from William H Viehweg (Attachments: #1 envelope) (RES)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Sue E. Myerscough disqualifies and recuses herself from participation in this matter pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). This matter is referred to Chief Judge Sara Darrow for reassignment. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 3/2/2023. (MJC) Modified on 3/2/2023 - Removed extra T in the word TEXT (MJC).
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is reassigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow for further proceedings. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 3/2/2023. (MJC)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught. Judge McNaught disqualifies and recuses herself from participation in this matter pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). This matter is referred to Chief Judge Sara Darrow for reassignment. Entered on 3/2/2023. (MJC)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long for further proceedings. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 3/2/2023. (MJC)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Mount Olive. Original summons returned to Plaintiff William Viehweg over the counter at the Clerks Office. (JPS)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joe Berry, Jeff Bone, Joseph Bracey, Brown & James, P.C., City of Mount Olive, Chuck Cox, John P Cunningham, John Goldacker, Howard Hall, Daniel G Hasenstab, Henry Meisenheimer & Gende, Inc., Bradley G Hummert, Insurance Programs Management Group, LLC, Benjamin Jacobi, Molly Margaritas, Karen L McNaught, Lawrence E Neyland, Dan O'Brien, O'Holloran Kosoff Geitner & Cook, LLC, Ernie Parish, Gregg Peterson, Steve Remer, Marcia Schulte, John M Skertich, Richard Webb, Leah Wheatley, Melinda Zippay (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by William H Viehweg. Receipt # 300000405. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(JPS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viehweg v. Insurance Programs Management Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H Viehweg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Programs Management Group, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mount Olive
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M Skertich
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Berry
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Zippay
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Schulte
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Hall
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Webb
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernie Parish
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Remer
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Wheatley
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Goldacker
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Cox
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan O'Brien
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly Margaritas
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Bone
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley G Hummert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Meisenheimer & Gende, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Holloran Kosoff Geitner & Cook, LLC
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen L McNaught
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence E Neyland
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Jacobi
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Bracey
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown & James, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel G Hasenstab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Peterson
Represented By: Joseph Bracey
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?