Robertson v. QC Franchise Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dawn M. Robertson
Defendant: QC Franchise Group LLC doing business as QC Kinetix, Regenerative Health of Champaign, LLC doing business as QC Kinetix - Champaign, Med-Den Funding, LLC doing business as Proceed Finance and Security First Bank
Case Number: 3:2023cv03333
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colleen R Lawless
Referring Judge: Karen L McNaught
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Megan Riley Escobosa on behalf of QC Franchise Group LLC (Escobosa, Megan)
January 9, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jared Sean Kramer on behalf of QC Franchise Group LLC (Kramer, Jared)
January 9, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Andrew J. Butcher on behalf of QC Franchise Group LLC (Butcher, Andrew)
January 9, 2024 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant QC Franchise Group LLC. (JMB)
January 9, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant QC Franchise Group LLC. Responses due by 1/23/2024 (JMB) (Main Document 21 replaced on 1/9/2024) (JMB).
January 9, 2024 TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught: The motion of defendant QC Franchise Group for leave to file a memorandum in excess of the page limit #20 is ALLOWED. Although defendant asks for leave to file a memorandum of no more than 20 pages, defendant will be permitted to file its 25-page memorandum. The clerk is directed to file the motion found at pages 2 and 3 of [20-1] and the proposed memorandum found at pages 4 through 28 of [20-1]. (JMB)
January 8, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Page Limit by Defendant QC Franchise Group LLC. Responses due by 1/22/2024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Memorandum in Support Thereof, and Proposed Order)(Phillips, Kevin)
January 8, 2024 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Security First Bank. (Weller, Jennifer)
January 8, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Security First Bank. Responses due by 1/22/2024 (Weller, Jennifer)
January 8, 2024 TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught: The motion of defendant QC Franchise Group for leave to file a memorandum in excess of the page limit #17 is DENIED without prejudice to refiling a motion with the proposed memorandum attached as an exhibit as required by Rule 7.1(F). (JMB)
January 5, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (UNOPPOSED MOTION) by Defendant QC Franchise Group LLC. Responses due by 1/19/2024 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Kevin)
December 19, 2023 TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 12/19/2022: The motion by defendant QC Franchise Group, LLC for an extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint #16 is ALLOWED. All defendants shall respond by January 8, 2024. (JPL)
December 18, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer UNOPPOSED by Defendant QC Franchise Group LLC. (Phillips, Kevin)
December 18, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kevin M. Phillips on behalf of QC Franchise Group LLC (Phillips, Kevin)
December 13, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jennifer Wigington Weller on behalf of Security First Bank (Weller, Jennifer)
December 13, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Retain Counsel by Defendant QC Franchise Group LLC. Responses due by 12/27/2023. (JPL)
December 12, 2023 TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 12/12/2023: The motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint #12 by Security First Bank is ALLOWED. Security First Bank shall respond to the complaint by January 8, 2024. (JPL)
December 11, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, (Unopposed) by Defendant Security First Bank. Responses due by 1/8/2024 (Schultz, David)
December 11, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David M Schultz on behalf of Security First Bank (Schultz, David)
December 5, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn M. Robertson. QC Franchise Group LLC served on 11/28/2023, answer due 12/19/2023. (Clark, Dulijaza)
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn M. Robertson. Security First Bank served on 11/20/2023, answer due 12/11/2023. (Goodwin, Tara)
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn M. Robertson. Med-Den Funding, LLC served on 11/20/2023, answer due 12/11/2023. (Goodwin, Tara)
November 27, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn M. Robertson. Regenerative Health of Champaign, LLC served on 11/21/2023, answer due 12/12/2023. (Goodwin, Tara)
November 17, 2023 Filing 6 STRUCK per Text Order of 11/17/2023. Letter from Clerk of the Court re letter requesting copies #9 . (JPL) Struck as inadvertently filed in this case--Modified on 11/17/2023 (DM).
November 17, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Med-Den Funding, LLC, QC Franchise Group LLC, Regenerative Health of Champaign, LLC, Security First Bank. Original summons mailed to Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin, LLC to effectuate service. (JPL)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colleen R. Lawless on 11/17/2023. Docket entry #6 was inadvertently docketed in this case and is struck. (DM)
November 16, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Dulijaza Clark on behalf of Dawn M. Robertson (Clark, Dulijaza)
November 16, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Tara Leigh Goodwin on behalf of Dawn M. Robertson (Goodwin, Tara)
November 16, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Daniel A Edelman on behalf of Dawn M. Robertson (Edelman, Daniel)
November 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-4343612.), filed by Dawn M. Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons of QC Franchise Group LLC, #11 Summons of Regenerative Health Group, LLC, #12 Summons of Med-Den Funding, LLC, #13 Summons of Security First Bank)(Edelman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. QC Franchise Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn M. Robertson
Represented By: Dulijaza Clark
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QC Franchise Group LLC doing business as QC Kinetix
Represented By: Andrew J. Butcher
Represented By: Jared Sean Kramer
Represented By: Kevin M. Phillips
Represented By: Megan Riley Escobosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regenerative Health of Champaign, LLC doing business as QC Kinetix - Champaign
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med-Den Funding, LLC doing business as Proceed Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security First Bank
Represented By: David M Schultz
Represented By: Jennifer Wigington Weller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?