Calhoun v. Wexford Health Sources Inc et al
Plaintiff: Cory William Calhoun
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Inc and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2025cv03026
Filed: January 31, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2025 Filing 13 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Wexford Health Sources Inc. (Taylor, Bradley)
March 27, 2025 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Wexford Health Sources Inc.(Taylor, Bradley)
March 27, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Bradley James Taylor on behalf of Wexford Health Sources Inc (Taylor, Bradley)
March 14, 2025 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 3/14/2025, in the amount of $14.89; receipt number PIA100006361. (JS)
March 12, 2025 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cory William Calhoun. Wexford Health Sources Inc waiver sent on 3/6/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (SAG)
March 6, 2025 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Wexford Health Sources Inc on 3/6/2025. (SAG)
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by District Judge Jonathan E Hawley on 3/5/2025. SEE WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG)
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by District Judge Jonathan E Hawley on 3/5/2025. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1) According to the Court's merit review of Plaintiff's Complaint under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915A, this case shall proceed on an Eighth Amendment deliberate indifference claim against Defendants Dentist John Doe and Wexford Health Sources, Inc. Additional claims shall not be included in the case above, except in the Court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG)
February 10, 2025 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by District Judge Jonathan E Hawley on 2/10/25 granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $9.89. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of this order. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source, including gifts. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office, and to Plaintiff. Prisoner Prepayment due by 3/12/2025. (ANW)
February 7, 2025 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Cory William Calhoun. (SB)
January 31, 2025 Filing 5 Letter Requesting Trust Fund Ledger. Trust fund ledger sheets due by 2/14/2025. (SAG)
January 31, 2025 Filing 4 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Cory William Calhoun. Responses due by 2/14/2025 (SAG)
January 31, 2025 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Cory William Calhoun.(SAG)
January 31, 2025 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Jonathan E Hawley. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street,Peoria,IL 61602.Merit Review Deadline set for 2/20/2025. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG)
January 31, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cory William Calhoun.(SAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calhoun v. Wexford Health Sources Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory William Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Inc
Represented By: Bradley James Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?