Lagarde v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Marvin Lagarde
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2010cv04004
Filed: January 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Rock Island Office
County: Rock Island
Presiding Judge: John A. Gorman
Presiding Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER & OPINION Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 10/5/10 granting 16 Motion to Dismiss: FOR THE FOREGOING REASONS, Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS SO ORDERED. CASE TERMINATED. (TK, ilcd)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER & OPINION Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 8/18/10 re 8 Order on Motion to Remand, Order on Motion to Substitute Party: THE COURT HAS, SUA SPONTE, reconsidered the portion of Magistrate Judge Gorman's January 21, 2010 Order granting the United States' Motion to Substitute itself as Defendant, and hereby AFFIRMS that Order. The United States was properly substituted as Defendant in this case pursuant to 28 USC §2679(d)(1). This matter is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Gorman for further pretrial proceedings. (TK, ilcd)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER & OPINION Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 7/19/10 denying 9 Motion to Dismiss: FOR THE FOREGOING REASONS, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (doc.#9) is therefore DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with leave to renew once the Court has determine d whether substitution of defendants was appropriate in this case. Plaintiff MAY file a brief and evidence, if any, contravening the evidence presented by Defendant in its Reply; such brief and evidence are DUE by August 13, 2010 (Misc. 8/13/2010). IT IS SO ORDERED. (TK, ilcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lagarde v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Lagarde
Represented By: Stephen T Fieweger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Gerard A Brost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?