Lieberman et al v. Scott et al
Petitioner: Michael Hansen, Samuel Lewis, Michael Halbrook, Anthony Lepard, Christopher Tatara, Brad Lieberman, William Ragel, David Isbell, Christopher L Derry, Mark Telford, Kenneth Seidler and Samuel Rutherford
Respondent: Greg Scott
Undetermined: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 4:2018cv04162
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Rock Island Office
County: Schuyler
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: This case reassigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce for further proceedings. All dates to remain as previously scheduled. Entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 10/11/2018. (MC, ilcd)
September 24, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for class certification filed by Respondent Greg Scott. (Beyer Payne, Lindsay)
August 23, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to the #3 motion due by September 28, 2018. (LN, ilcd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 27 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER as to William Ragel. (LN, ilcd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 26 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER as to Samuel Rutherford. (LN, ilcd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 25 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER as to Samuel Lewis. (LN, ilcd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 24 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER as to Michael Hansen. (LN, ilcd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 23 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER as to Michael Halbrook. (LN, ilcd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 22 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER as to Mark Telford. (LN, ilcd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 21 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER as to Kenneth Seidler. (LN, ilcd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 20 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER as to Christopher Tatara. (LN, ilcd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 19 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER as to Brad Lieberman. (LN, ilcd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 18 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER as to Anthony Lepard. (LN, ilcd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 17 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER as to David Isbell. (LN, ilcd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 16 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER as to Christopher L Derry. (LN, ilcd)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on August 21, 2018. Respondent filed a #15 motion for extension of time to respond to Petitioners' #3 motion for leave to file a joint or class action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Respondent seeks an extension to September 28. 2018. The #15 motion is GRANTED and the response to the #3 motion is now due September 28, 2018. (KML, ilcd)
August 20, 2018 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION for class certification by Respondent Greg Scott. Responses due by 9/4/2018 (Beyer Payne, Lindsay)
August 20, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lindsay M Beyer Payne on behalf of Greg Scott (Beyer Payne, Lindsay)
August 17, 2018 Filing 13 Letter from Clerk of Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (LN, ilcd)
August 15, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Mark Telford. Responses due by 8/29/2018. (LN, ilcd)
August 15, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Christopher Tatara. Responses due by 8/29/2018. (LN, ilcd)
August 15, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Samuel Lewis. Responses due by 8/29/2018. (LN, ilcd)
August 15, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Samuel Rutherford. Responses due by 8/29/2018. (LN, ilcd)
August 15, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner William Ragel. Responses due by 8/29/2018. (LN, ilcd)
August 15, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner David Isbell. Responses due by 8/29/2018. (LN, ilcd)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Michael Halbrook. Responses due by 8/29/2018. (LN, ilcd)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Michael Hansen. Responses due by 8/29/2018. (LN, ilcd)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Christopher L Derry. Responses due by 8/29/2018. (LN, ilcd)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 COMBINED PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE JOINT OR CLASS ACTION 28 U.S.C 2254 by Petitioners Christopher L Derry, Michael Halbrook, Michael Hansen, David Isbell, Anthony Lepard, Samuel Lewis, Brad Lieberman, William Ragel, Samuel Rutherford, Kenneth Seidler, Christopher Tatara, Mark Telford. Responses due by 8/29/2018. (LN, ilcd)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 Exhibits to #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Christopher L Derry, Michael Halbrook, Michael Hansen, David Isbell, Anthony Lepard, Samuel Lewis, Brad Lieberman, William Ragel, Samuel Rutherford, Kenneth Seidler, Christopher Tatara, Mark Telford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(LN, ilcd)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Samuel Rutherford, Samuel Lewis, Kenneth Seidler, William Ragel, Michael Hansen, Brad Lieberman, Christopher L Derry, Christopher Tatara, David Isbell, Michael Halbrook, Anthony Lepard, Mark Telford. (Attachments: #1 Petition Continued, #2 Petition Continued)(LN, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lieberman et al v. Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samuel Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Halbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Lepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Tatara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brad Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Ragel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Isbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher L Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Telford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Seidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samuel Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Greg Scott
Represented By: Lindsay M Beyer Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?