Kelly v. The Project of the Quad Cities, Inc.

Plaintiff: Wendy Kelly
Defendant: The Project of the Quad Cities, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04078
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Wendy Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion)(Fieweger, Stephen)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant The Project of the Quad Cities, Inc.. (Gorham, Sarah)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant The Project of the Quad Cities, Inc.. Responses due by 5/28/2019 (Gorham, Sarah)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Sarah Louise Gorham on behalf of The Project of the Quad Cities, Inc. (Gorham, Sarah)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wendy Kelly. All Defendants. (Fieweger, Stephen)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Project of the Quad Cities, Inc.. (LN, ilcd)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Project of the Quad Cities, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3081611.), filed by Wendy Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Fieweger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. The Project of the Quad Cities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Project of the Quad Cities, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Louise Gorham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Kelly
Represented By: Stephen T Fieweger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?