Tosh v. Pritzker et al

Plaintiff: Jason Tosh
Defendant: Mendi Pilger, Henry Hill Correctional Center, Stephanie J Dorethy, Lois Lindorff, MD Catalino Bautista, John Does, Mark N Williams, Wexford Health Sources Inc, Ek, Dr. Steve Meeks, Doctor Ritz, John R Baldwin, Christopher McLaughlin, Dr Garcia, Nurse Jane Doe and Jay Robert Pritzker
Case Number: 4:2019cv04081
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Stephanie J Dorethy on 6/26/2019. (KE, ilcd)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 6/26/2019. See written order.(KE, ilcd)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MERIT REVIEW AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 6/26/2019. The clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. The clerk is directed to terminate all named Defendants other than Defendant Warden Stephanie Dorethy. The clerk is directed to effect service of process upon Defendant Warden Stephanie Dorethy at the Hill Correctional Center pursuant to the Court's standard procedures. See written order. (Rule 16 Deadline 8/26/2019.) (KE, ilcd)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Clerk to plaintiff Jason Tosh regarding copies. (KM, ilcd)
April 29, 2019 Filing fee received from plaintiff Jason Tosh: $ 400.00, receipt number 24626008642. (KM, ilcd)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Jason Tosh. (KM, ilcd)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 Response by Jason Tosh to #2 Text Order and requesting copy of local rules. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees/Costs)(KM, ilcd)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jason Tosh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(SKR, ilcd)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 4/26/19. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file amended complaint #3 is GRANTED. Plaintiff has submitted a document that appears to be an amended complaint, in that, it contains changes to the Complaint that he originally filed with the Court. The Court will treat this second document as an amended complaint, and the Court will conduct a merit review of this amended complaint as soon as possible. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file Plaintiff's document #3 as his amended complaint. (SKR, ilcd)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Jason Tosh. Responses due by 5/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (KM, ilcd)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 4/16/19. Plaintiff has filed a Complaint but has not paid the $400 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 21 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff must pay the $400 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis with attached trust fund ledgers for the last 6 months. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Plaintiff will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis. ( Other Deadline set for 5/7/2019.) (SKR, ilcd)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jason Tosh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(SKR, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tosh v. Pritzker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Tosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mendi Pilger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Hill Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie J Dorethy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois Lindorff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Catalino Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark N Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Steve Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Ritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Robert Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?