Bennett v. Council 31 of the American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO et al
Plaintiff: Susan Bennett
Defendant: Andrea Waintroob, Kwame Raoul, Lynne Sered, Lara Shayne, Gilbert O'Brien, Jr, AFSCME Local 672, Council 31 of the American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO, Moline-Coal Valley School District No. 40 and Judy Biggert
Case Number: 4:2019cv04087
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 7/26/2019 at 11:15 AM via telephone (Court to set up the call). If Counsel are to be reached at a number different than what is listed on the docket sheet, they are directed to phone Judge Hawley's courtroom deputy at 309-671-7117 and confirm the phone number where they may be reached for the call. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 7/23/2019. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/28/2019. (WG, ilcd)
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant District's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against AFSCME Local 672, Council 31 of the American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO by Moline-Coal Valley School District No. 40. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Satterly, Caitlin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by AFSCME Local 672, Council 31 of the American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO.(Karabell, Jacob)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants Judy Biggert, Gilbert O'Brien, Jr, Kwame Raoul, Lynne Sered, Lara Shayne, Andrea Waintroob. (Ioppolo, Thomas)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Judy Biggert, Gilbert O'Brien, Jr, Kwame Raoul, Lynne Sered, Lara Shayne, Andrea Waintroob. Responses due by 7/11/2019 (Ioppolo, Thomas)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #13 Defendant Moline-Coal Valley School District NO. 40's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendant Board of Education of Moline-Coal Valley School District NO. 40's answer or other responsive pleading is due by 6/27/2019. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/13/2019. (KZ, ilcd)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Moline-Coal Valley School District No. 40. Responses due by 6/26/2019 (Satterly, Caitlin)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Stephen A Yokich on behalf of AFSCME Local 672, Council 31 of the American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO (Yokich, Stephen)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Melissa J Auerbach on behalf of AFSCME Local 672, Council 31 of the American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO (Auerbach, Melissa)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Caitlin Frazier Satterly on behalf of Moline-Coal Valley School District No. 40 (Satterly, Caitlin)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jason T Manning on behalf of Moline-Coal Valley School District No. 40 (Manning, Jason)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants AFSCME Local 672, Judy Biggert, Council 31 of the American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO, Gilbert O'Brien, Jr, Kwame Raoul, Lynne Sered, Lara Shayne and Andrea Waintroob shall file their responsive pleadings by 6/27/2019. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/7/19. (WG, ilcd)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Defendants AFSCME Local 672, Council 31 of the American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO. Responses due by 6/20/2019 (Karabell, Jacob)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Thomas A Ioppolo on behalf of Judy Biggert, Gilbert O'Brien, Jr, Lynne Sered, Lara Shayne, Andrea Waintroob (Ioppolo, Thomas)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Thomas A Ioppolo on behalf of Kwame Raoul (Ioppolo, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by April H Pullium on behalf of AFSCME Local 672, Council 31 of the American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO (Pullium, April)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jacob R Karabell on behalf of AFSCME Local 672, Council 31 of the American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO (Karabell, Jacob)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Correction re #1 Complaint, (Schwab, Jeffrey)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to all defendants. (LN, ilcd)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3092341.), filed by Susan Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Schwab, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2019: #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (LN, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. Council 31 of the American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Waintroob
Represented By: Thomas A Ioppolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kwame Raoul
Represented By: Thomas A Ioppolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne Sered
Represented By: Thomas A Ioppolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lara Shayne
Represented By: Thomas A Ioppolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert O'Brien, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Ioppolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFSCME Local 672
Represented By: Stephen A Yokich
Represented By: April H Pullium
Represented By: Melissa J Auerbach
Represented By: Jacob R Karabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Council 31 of the American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Stephen A Yokich
Represented By: April H Pullium
Represented By: Melissa J Auerbach
Represented By: Jacob R Karabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moline-Coal Valley School District No. 40
Represented By: Jason T Manning
Represented By: Caitlin Frazier Satterly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Biggert
Represented By: Thomas A Ioppolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Bennett
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?