Nartey v. Macomb Community Unit School District #185

Plaintiff: Fredrick Nartey
Defendant: Macomb Community Unit School District #185
Case Number: 4:2019cv04107
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/16/19 at 10:45 AM via telephone (Court to set up the call). If Counsel are to be reached at a number different than what is listed on the docket sheet, they are directed to phone Judge Hawley's courtroom deputy at 309-671-7117 and confirm the phone number where they may be reached for the call. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 8/13/2019. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 7/11/2019. (WG, ilcd)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Caroline K Kane on behalf of Macomb Community Unit School District #185 (Kane, Caroline)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Nicole Beth Bazer on behalf of Macomb Community Unit School District #185 (Bazer, Nicole)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Macomb School District on 06/04/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Baker, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Fredrick Nartey. (Baker, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Macomb Community Unit School District #185 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3110936.), filed by Fredrick Nartey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baker, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nartey v. Macomb Community Unit School District #185
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macomb Community Unit School District #185
Represented By: Nicole Beth Bazer
Represented By: Caroline K Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Nartey
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?