Powers v. Scott et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Powers
Defendant: Jane Doe, John Doe and Gregg Scott
Case Number: 4:2019cv04136
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas Powers. USCA Case Number 19-2480. (GL, ilcd)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 Short Record of Appeal Sent to US Court of Appeals re #11 Notice of Appeal. (GL, ilcd)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Thomas Powers re #11 Notice of Appeal. (GL, ilcd)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 8/16/2019. (GL, ilcd)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Thomas Powers. (Attachments: #1 Scanning Sheet)(GL, ilcd)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 7/31/2019. Plaintiffs #10 motion to reconsider the dismissal of this case without prejudice for Plaintiffs failure to pay the $2.58 reduced filing fee is denied for the reasons stated in the Courts 7/24/19 order. (SAG, ilcd)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Scanning Sheet)(GL, ilcd)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 7/24/2019. Plaintiff's motion to waive fees is denied. #8 . The case is dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to pay the $2.58 reduced filing fee. Plaintiff's petition to proceed in forma pauperis is denied #3 because Plaintiff has not paid the $2.58 reduced filing fee and has not shown good cause why the fee should be waived. Plaintiff's motion for counsel is moot. #5 . The clerk is directed to close this case. No judgment shall enter. See written order.(KE, ilcd)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Waive Fees by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Scanning Sheet)(GL, ilcd)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This Court has instituted a reduced filing fee procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment will be assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $400 filing fee). Income includes all deposits from any source. Plaintiff Thomas Powers is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. Plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $5.16. Plaintiff is ordered to send an institutional check or money order in the amount of $2.58, payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court within 30 days from the date of this order. The reduced fee may be waived if the plaintiff, within 14 days of this order, files a motion to waive the fee and demonstrates good cause for such waiver. ( Miscellaneous Deadline 8/12/2019) Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 7/12/2019. (KE, ilcd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Thomas Powers. (KE, ilcd)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Thomas Powers. (KE, ilcd)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk of Court to Rushville TDF Trust Fund Dept requesting ledgers 1/9/2019 through 7/9/19 (SAG, ilcd)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Springfield Division, 600 E Monroe, Springfield,IL 62701.Merit Review Deadline set for 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 7/19/2019 (SAG, ilcd)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 7/19/2019 (SAG, ilcd)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas Powers.(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers v. Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?