Arrington v. Sullivan et al
Plaintiff: Otis Arrington
Defendant: . Clark, . Hammers, John Baldwin, John Doe, GTL Lexis Advice, P Sullivan, Dave White, Sarah Johnson and Brandon Shrader
Case Number: 4:2019cv04157
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT entered in a civil case (SAG, ilcd)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 9/26/2019. In its Order entered August 30, 2019, the Court denied Plaintiff Motion to Waive Court Filing Fees, directed Plaintiff to pay the initial partial filing fee within 14 days, and warned Plaintiff that failure to do so would result in dismissal of this case. Plaintiff failed to comply. Accordingly, this case is dismissed without prejudice. All pending motions are denied as moot, and this case is closed.(SAG, ilcd)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 8/30/2019. Plaintiff's Motion to Waive Court Fee #8 is denied. Plaintiff shall pay the initial, partial filing fee of $91.12 within 14 days of entry of this Order, or this case will be dismissed without prejudice. See written order. (KE, ilcd)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Waive Court Filing Fees by Plaintiff Otis Arrington. Responses due by 8/23/2019 (Attachment: #1 Scanning Sheet)(MAS, ilcd)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This Court has instituted a reduced filing fee procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment will be assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $400 filing fee). Income includes all deposits from any source. Plaintiff Otis Arrington is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. Plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $182.24. Plaintiff is ordered to send an institutional check or money order in the amount of $91.12, payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court within 30 days from the date of this order. The reduced fee may be waived if the plaintiff, within 14 days of this order, files a motion to waive the fee and demonstrates good cause for such waiver. Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 8/7/2019. (SAG, ilcd)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. as to Rushville TDF (SAG, ilcd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Otis Arrington. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (SAG, ilcd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk of Court to Rushville TDF Trust Fund Dept. requesting trust fund ledgers 2/6/19 through 8/6/19 (SAG, ilcd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Otis Arrington (SAG, ilcd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Otis Arrington. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (SAG, ilcd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Otis Arrington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits part 1, #2 Exhibits part 2, #3 scanning sheets)(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrington v. Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Hammers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTL Lexis Advice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Shrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?