Powers v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Powers
Defendant: John or Jane Does, Travis Smith, Gregg Scott and Curtis Parsons
Case Number: 4:2019cv04161
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA regarding #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas Powers. USCA Case Number 19-3007 (RL, ilcd)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 Short Record of Appeal Sent to US Court of Appeals re #7 Notice of Appeal. (SKN, ilcd)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 10/24/2019 (SKN, ilcd)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Thomas Powers re #7 Notice of Appeal. (SKN, ilcd)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to Order filed on 10/8/2019 re Motion to Waive Fees #6 by Thomas Powers. (SKN, ilcd)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 10/8/2019. Plaintiff's motion to waive the reduced filing fee of $1.67 is denied. This case is dismissed without prejudice for failing to pay the reduced filing fee. Pending motions are moot. #3 . The clerk is directed to close this case. No judgment will enter. (KE, ilcd)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Waive Fees by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 9/9/2019 (SKN, ilcd)
August 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Miscellaneous Deadline 9/4/2019 (SAG, ilcd)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 8/21/2019: This Court has instituted a reduced filing fee procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment will be assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $400 filing fee). Income includes all deposits from any source. Plaintiff Thomas Powers is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. Plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $3.33. Plaintiff is ordered to send an institutional check or money order in the amount of $1.67, payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court within 30 days from the date of this order. The reduced fee may be waived if the plaintiff, within 14 days of this order, files a motion to waive the fee and demonstrates good cause for such waiver. (KE, ilcd)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Thomas Powers. (SKN, ilcd)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting trust fund ledgers. (KE, ilcd)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 8/30/2019 (KE, ilcd)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Springfield Division, 600 E Monroe, Springfield,IL 62701.Merit Review Deadline set for 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas Powers. (Attachments: #1 Scanning Page)(KE, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?